N.P. et al v. Kenton County Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: N.P. and Stephanie Ponder
Defendant: Principal Trent Steiner, Trent Steiner, Bridget Dugan, Craig Reinhart, Shannon Herold, Unknown Teacher 2, Principal Craig Reinhart, Shannon Gross, John Popham, Marta Kirk, Carl Wicklund, Henry Webb, Tyler Kiefer, Kenton County Public Schools, Jason Fraiser, Jesica Jehn, Karen Collins, Unknown Teacher 1, Martha Setters, Dustin Jones, Kenton County Board of Education, Steve Funke and Carla Egan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00142
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by N.P., Stephanie Ponder. Kenton County Board of Education waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Chevalier, Marianne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenton County Board of Education. All Defendants. (Deters, Jeremy)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenton County Public Schools. (Deters, Jeremy)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1. That this case be, and it is, hereby referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial. 2. That, in connection with such reference, the said Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), except motions in limine. See Brown v. Wesleys Quaker Maid, Inc., 771 F.2d 952 (6th Cir. 1985). Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to theundersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). 23. Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Partiesshall meet/or confer in an attempt to resolve disputes between themselves, without judicial intervention; (2) if the parties are unable to resolve such disputes informally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; (3) if, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their disputes after conference with theMagistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Local Rule 37.1. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
October 5, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4792417), filed by N.P., Stephanie Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.P. et al v. Kenton County Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Trent Steiner
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Steiner
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Dugan
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Reinhart
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Herold
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Teacher 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Craig Reinhart
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Gross
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Popham
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marta Kirk
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Wicklund
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Webb
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Kiefer
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton County Public Schools
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Fraiser
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesica Jehn
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Collins
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Teacher 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Setters
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Jones
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton County Board of Education
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Funke
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Egan
Represented By: Jeremy John Deters
Represented By: Wesley Kiser Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.P.
Represented By: Marianne Schaefer Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ponder
Represented By: Marianne Schaefer Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?