Rollins v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Rollins
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00152
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before December 4, 2020 These disclosures should not be filed in the Court record. (2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings Deadline for Plaintiff on or before February 15, 2021 Deadline for Defendant on or before March 15, 2021 (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports Deadline for Plaintiff on or before July 30, 2021 Deadline for Defendant on or before September 24, 2021 These reports should not be filed in the Court record. Supplementation of expert information as required by Rule 26(e)(2) will be made in conjunction with Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures. (4) Fact Discovery on or before June 30, 2021 (5) Expert Discovery on or before November 19, 2021 (6) Status Report on or before November 19, 2021 (close of discovery) The report should indicate the progress of the case and the status of settlement negotiations, the likelihood of settlement, and the feasibility of alternative dispute resolution, including the parties views on the method of resolution (i.e., mediation, arbitration, settlement conference with the Court, summary jury trial, etc.). (7) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before December 20, 2021 (8) Copies of Memoranda A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing; said courtesy copy should be in paper form or electronic format (Using Word) e-mailed to Judge Bunnings Chambers. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/13/2020.(KRB)cc: COR
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mays, Laura)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status. Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports, which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Orders. report. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KRB)cc: COR
October 29, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: Answer to Complaint (ECO)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURES Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Mays, Laura)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Laura Mays. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
October 27, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Filed as part of State Court Record DE #1 Attachment #3).(ECO) Modified on 10/28/2020 (ECO).
October 27, 2020 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-638. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4810410), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) Modified to correct file date on 10/28/2020 (ECO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollins v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rollins
Represented By: Brandon W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?