Garrouzoo, Inc. v. Mila International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Garrouzoo, Inc.
Defendant: Mila International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #14 Filed by Mila International, Inc. By agreement of the parties, Defendant, MILA International, Inc. (MILA), shall have up to and including March 10, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 02/02/2021.(SLG)cc: COR
January 29, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #14 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Mila International, Inc. (SLG)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Mila International, Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mila International, Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mila International, Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCOMPLETE document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; INCOMPLETE PDF uploaded re #3 Summons Issued ; Correct document attached to this entry. *CBD* cc: COR (ECO)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #8 MOTION for Jonathan J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Garrouzoo, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/11/2021. (SLG)cc: COR and Jonathan J. Fagan by US Mail. Mailing a copy of the ECF Registration Form. Modified on 1/12/2021 (SLG).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #7 MOTION for John D. Luken to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Garrouzoo, Inc., the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/11/2021. (Smith, Candace)cc: COR (SLG)cc: COR
January 11, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #8 MOTION for Jonathan J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868768), #7 MOTION for John D. Luken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868756). (SLG)
January 11, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John D. Luken, Jonathan J. Fagan re #8 MOTION for Jonathan J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868768), #7 MOTION for John D. Luken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868756). (SLG)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Jonathan J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868768)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jonathan J. Fagan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Grahmn)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for John D. Luken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrouzoo, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4868756)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John D. Luken, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Grahmn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (ECO)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
January 5, 2021 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Garrouzoo, Inc. (ECO)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mila International, Inc. ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4864825), filed by Garrouzoo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of '100 patent, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of '912 patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Mila International)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrouzoo, Inc. v. Mila International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mila International, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrouzoo, Inc.
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John D. Luken
Represented By: Jonathan J. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?