Link v. Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Trena Link
Defendant: Alice E. Daniel and Akram N. Daniel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00013
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures - 4/30/2021. 2) Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings - 1/3/2022. 3) Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures/Reports for Plaintiff 2/1/2022, for Defendants 2/15/2022. 4) Fact Discovery 1/3/2022. 5) Status Reports on or before 1/3/2022. 6) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before 4/1/2022. 7) Copies of Memoranda must be provided to chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/23/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davidson, David)
February 22, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TJZ)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this Order, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: (a) the proposed discovery plan; (b) the parties estimate of the time necessary to file pretrial motions; (c) the parties belief as to whether the matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; (d) the parties' estimate as to the probable length of trial; and (e) whether the parties will consent to the jurisdiction of a MagistrateJudge (Smith) for all further proceedings, including trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c).Consent forms are attached to this Order and forms signed by all parties counsel shouldbe filed no later than the date counsels' joint status report is due. If all parties, by counsel,so consent, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to the appropriate Magistrate Judge without the necessity of further order of the Court. L.R. 73.1(c). Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each fileindividual reports, which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out itsScheduling Order or other appropriate Orders. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(ECO)cc: COR
February 9, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #6 Notice of Filing Answer to Complaint, #4 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
February 8, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alice E. Daniel. Filed as part of State Court Record re #1 Notice of Removal/ #6 Notice of Filing Answer. (ECO)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Akram N. Daniel re #1 Notice of Removal Answer of Alice Daniel (Davidson, David)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant Estate of Akram N. Daniel shall file a copy of Defendant Alice Daniel's Answer in this case by 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/5/2021.(TJZ)cc: COR
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Akram N. Daniel.(Davidson, David)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TJZ)cc: COR
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grant Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-361. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4881798), filed by The Estate of Akram N. Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(TJZ)
January 27, 2021 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Link v. Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice E. Daniel
Represented By: Michael W. Bouldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akram N. Daniel
Represented By: David E. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trena Link
Represented By: Jack S. Gatlin
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Represented By: David Harold Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?