Trapp v. Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Charles C. Trapp
Defendant: Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC, A & A Safety, Inc., Klekamp & Company, Inc., Bansal Construction, Inc. and John Does
Case Number: 2:2021cv00101
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. See FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f). (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing. (See Order for Details) (3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports, which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Orders. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(SLG)cc: COR
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A & A Safety, Inc.. (Langston, Malinda)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kimberly A. Kyle/Malinda L. Langston has been filed by A & A Safety, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by A & A Safety, Inc..(Langston, Malinda)
October 13, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #7 Answer to Complaint, #11 Answer to Complaint. (SLG)
October 13, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #7 Answer to Complaint, #13 Answer to Complaint, #11 Answer to Complaint. (SLG)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC. (Spille, Timothy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC.(Spille, Timothy)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Klekamp & Company, Inc. re #9 MOTION by Klekamp & Company, Inc. for Court to Assert Supplemental Jurisdiction of Withdrawal of Motion for Court to Assert Supplemental Jurisdiction (Trombetta, Patricia)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Klekamp & Company, Inc. for Court to Assert Supplemental Jurisdiction Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trombetta, Patricia)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Mark Roth: It appears the address listed on your filing #7 Answer to Complaint is different than the address registered with PACER. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (ECO)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bansal Construction, Inc.. (Maloney, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bansal Construction, Inc..(Maloney, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Klekamp & Company, Inc.. (Trombetta, Patricia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Klekamp & Company, Inc.. (Trombetta, Patricia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Patricia J. Trombetta. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Klekamp & Company, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: : 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(SLG)cc: COR
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00981. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5050524) filed by Klekamp & Company, Inc., Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC, A & A Safety, Inc., John Does, Bansal Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLG)
August 25, 2021 Conflict Check run. (SLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trapp v. Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Trapp
Represented By: Jerry M. Miniard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houck Asphalt Maintenance, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Bernard Spille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & A Safety, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kyle
Represented By: Malinda L. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klekamp & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia J. Trombetta
Represented By: Thomas F. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bansal Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Roth
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?