Plater v. Hall
Plaintiff: Raheem L. Platter and Raheem L. Plater
Defendant: Krista L. Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv00108
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #17 Complaint, #18 Complaint (ECO)
November 8, 2021 Filing 18 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Raheem L. Plater, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 2, #2 Envelope 3)(ECO)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 COPIES OF DOCUMENTS ADDRESSED TO THE DEFENDANT ASKING THE COURT TO MAIL, filed by Raheem L. Plater, pro se. (Documents were not mailed to Defendant) (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1)(ECO) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (TJZ).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: 1. The Clerk's Office shall send Plater a blank "Complaint for a Civil Case" Form, which is the Pro Se 1 Form that is available at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/pro- se-forms/ complaint-civil-case. 2. If Plater wants to proceed with this matter, then he must comply with the instructions set forth above, complete the Pro Se 1 Form in full, sign it, and file it with this Court within 30 days from the entry of this Order. If Plater does not complete and file the Pro Se 1 Form within the time allotted, the Court will dismiss this action. 3. In light of this Order, Plater's recent motions asking to file another submission and requesting a jury trial [Rs. #14 and #15 ] are DENIED at this time. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/25/2021.(ECO)cc: COR and Raheem L. Plater w/copy of Order and Pro SE 1 Form and Krista L. Hall w/copy of Order by US Mail
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Jury Trial by Raheem L. Plater, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope-Post Mark Illegible)(ECO)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Reply to Answer by Raheem L. Plater, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope past marked 10/18/21)(ECO)
October 22, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #14 MOTION for Leave to File by Raheem L. Plater, #15 MOTION for Jury Trial by Raheem L. Plater (ECO)
October 14, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #11 Answer to Complaint (ECO)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(ECO)cc: CORand Krista L. Hall by US Mail
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Krista L. Hall, pro se.(ECO)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of Service. USMS served via Certified Mail-USPS Package Tracking-Delivered, Left with Individual, filed by Raheem L. Plater. (ECO)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Krista L. Hall,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (ECO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2021: #1 time stamped receipt) (ECO).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The Deputy Clerk shall prepare one (1) "Service Packet" for service upon defendant Krista L. Hall. That Service Packet shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. the complaint [R. 3]; c. this Order; and d. a completed USM Form 285. 2. The Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packet to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 3. The USMS shall serve the defendant by sending one Service Packet by certified mail, restricted delivery to addressee, return receipt requested, to the following: Krista L. Hall 129 Kenton Street Elsmere, Kentucky 41018 4. Within 21 days after being served, the defendant must answer Plater's complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. 5. Finally, Plater must immediately advise the Clerk's Office, in writing, of any change in his mailing address. If Plater fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/23/2021.(ECO)cc: COR, and Raheem L. Plater by US Mail
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Platers motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Payment of the $52.00 administrative fee is WAIVED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), Plater must pay the $350.00 filing fee in the manner set forth below. 2. Payment of an initial partial filing fee is WAIVED. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Plater's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form [E.D. Ky. 525 Form] with: (a) Plater's name; (b) his inmate registration number; and (c) this case number. The Clerk shall then send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form to the Warden of the institution where Plater is confined. 4. Plater's custodian shall send the Clerk of this Court a payment each month from his inmate trust fund account. The payment should be in an amount equal to 20% of Plater's income from the preceding month. However, the custodian shall only send a monthly payment if the amount in Plater's account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue the monthly payments until Platers entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). 5. This matter now stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/23/2021.(ECO)cc: COR, FIN and Raheem L. Plater by US Mail w/copy of E.D.Ky. Form 525; Copy of Order and Notice of Payment Form to Warden, Modified text on 9/23/2021 (ECO).
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Raheem L. Platter, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Envelope - no post mark)(ECO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Raheem L. Platter, pro se. (ECO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raheem L. Platter, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - No post mark)(ECO)
September 13, 2021 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 13, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raheem L. Platter, ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #3 Complaint (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plater v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raheem L. Platter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raheem L. Plater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?