Williamson v. Robey
Petitioner: Larry Williamson
Respondent: Amy Robey
Case Number: 2:2021cv00117
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: (1) The Motion to Hold the Case in Abeyance #4 is DENIED; however,Williamson may renew that request upon the filing of the answer or other response;(2) The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition and this Order uponRespondent Amy Robey, and the Attorney General of the Commonwealth ofKentucky;(3) The Commonwealth shall assist the Court in fulfilling its duties under 18 U.S.C. 3771(b)(2). To that end, the Court expects the Commonwealth to know the identityof any "victim" as defined by 18 U.S.C. 3771(b)(2)(D) and to keep such person(s)reasonably apprised of developments and public hearings in the case. Further, theCommonwealth shall provide to such person(s) a copy of 18 U.S.C. 3771. TheCommonwealth shall file a notice certifying its compliance with this paragraphwithin forty five (45) days.(4) That within sixty (60) days from the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response that addresses both the substance of theclaims and whether the petition is barred due to failure to exhaust state remedies, aprocedural bar, non-retroactivity, or a statute of limitations;(5) That with the response, Respondent shall indicate what transcripts are available,when they can be furnished, and what proceedings have been recorded but nottranscribed. Respondent shall also attach to the answer either parts of the transcriptshe considers relevant or, if she cannot obtain the transcript, a narrative summaryof the evidence; (6)That Respondent shall file a copy of any brief submitted by Petitioner in anappellate court contesting his conviction or sentence or an adverse judgment/orderin a post-conviction proceeding;(7) That Respondent shall file a copy of any brief submitted by the prosecution in anappellate court relating to Petitioners conviction or sentence;(8) That Respondent shall file a copy of the opinions and dispositive orders of theappellate court relating to Petitioners conviction or sentence;(9) That, upon the filing of the response, the Clerk of Court shall forward the record inthis matter to the undersigned for further review; and(10) That all pleadings must be submitted to the Clerk of Court. Each party shall berequired to include thereupon the required certificate of service, indicating that acopy of any such documents has been served upon the opposing party or its counsel,if represented by counsel. Any document received by the Clerk of Court that failsto include the required certificate of service shall not be filed and shall be returned to the party or counsel submitting such document.(11) Within forty-five (45) days of the date Respondent files her answer or response,Petitioner may file a reply, including a renewed request for a stay, if appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/9/2021.(ECO)cc: CORand Larry Williamson by US Mail and copy of the Petition and this Order to Respondent Amy Robey and the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 sample page)(TJZ)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:21-cv-00430. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 22, 2021 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
September 22, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re #4 MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance (TJZ)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/21/2021. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and LR 3.2(f), this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Northern Division at Covington. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Petitioner, pro se (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 9/22/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance by Petitioner Larry Williamson, pro se (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 9/22/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Larry Williamson regarding status. Docket sheet mailed 8/26/2021. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 9/22/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 9/22/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Gallatin Circuit Court, filed by Larry Williamson. (Fee Paid $5.00 Receipt #L33067303) (Attachments: #1 attachments, #2 cover letter) (CDF) Modified to include payment information on 7/7/2021 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?