York v. Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah York
Defendant: Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Garren Colvin, Gary Blank, Lori Ritchey Baldwin, Mike Yadav, Bill Banks, Brad Arthur, Debbie Simpson, Brian Robinson, Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD, Marsha Croxton, Tom Dietz, Meredith Donnelly, MD, Curtis Dorsch, MD, Jason Jackman, Mike Jones, MD, Kris Knochelmann, Joe Koester, Marsha Landenburger, Tillie Hidalgo Lima, Robert Moorhead, Roger Peterman, A.J. Schaeffer, Jackie Sweeney, MD and James Votruba
Case Number: 2:2021cv00125
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
2 Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: That further briefing on the Motion to Dismiss #6 will be stayed pending the adjudication of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #9 . Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/30/2021. (TDB)cc: COR
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sarah York filed by Brad Arthur, Lori Ritchey Baldwin, Bill Banks, Gary Blank, Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD, Garren Colvin, Marsha Croxton, Tom Dietz, Meredith Donnelly, MD, Curtis Dorsch, MD, Jason Jackman, Mike Jones, MD, Kris Knochelmann, Joe Koester, Marsha Landenburger, Tillie Hidalgo Lima, Robert Moorhead, Roger Peterman, Brian Robinson, Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., A.J. Schaeffer, Debbie Simpson, Jackie Sweeney, MD, James Votruba, Mike Yadav. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Lori Ritchey-Baldwin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Valerie Rose Declaration in Beckerich)(Markus, Christopher)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sarah York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Anthony)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Brad Arthur, Lori Ritchey Baldwin, Bill Banks, Gary Blank, Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD, Garren Colvin, Marsha Croxton, Tom Dietz, Meredith Donnelly, MD, Curtis Dorsch, MD, Jason Jackman, Mike Jones, MD, Kris Knochelmann, Joe Koester, Marsha Landenburger, Tillie Hidalgo Lima, Robert Moorhead, Roger Peterman, Brian Robinson, Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., A.J. Schaeffer, Debbie Simpson, Jackie Sweeney, MD, James Votruba, Mike Yadav.(Markus, Christopher)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Brad Arthur, Lori Ritchey Baldwin, Bill Banks, Gary Blank, Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD, Garren Colvin, Marsha Croxton, Tom Dietz, Meredith Donnelly, MD, Curtis Dorsch, MD, Jason Jackman, Mike Jones, MD, Kris Knochelmann, Joe Koester, Marsha Landenburger, Tillie Hidalgo Lima, Robert Moorhead, Roger Peterman, Brian Robinson, A.J. Schaeffer, Debbie Simpson, Jackie Sweeney, MD, James Votruba, Mike Yadav (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Markus, Christopher)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: That this matter be, and it is, hereby reassigned to the Honorable David L. Bunning, Judge of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/8/2021.(ECO)cc: COR
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.. (Markus, Christopher)
October 6, 2021 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-1401. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5092314), filed by Brad Arthur, Meredith Donnelly, MD, Marsha Croxton, Jackie Sweeney, MD, Curtis Dorsch, MD, Mike Jones, MD, Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD, Marsha Landenburger, Joe Koester, Lori Ritchey Baldwin, Mike Yadav, Gary Blank, James Votruba, Bill Banks, Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Kris Knochelmann, Roger Peterman, Tom Dietz, Debbie Simpson, Garren Colvin, Tillie Hidalgo Lima, Robert Moorhead, Jason Jackman, Brian Robinson, A.J. Schaeffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Lorie Ritchey-Baldwin, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit 4-State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 5-Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah York
Represented By: Anthony Dominick Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garren Colvin
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Blank
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Ritchey Baldwin
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Yadav
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Banks
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Arthur
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Simpson
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Robinson
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya Brown-Puryear, MD
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Croxton
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dietz
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Donnelly, MD
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Dorsch, MD
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jackman
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Jones, MD
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Knochelmann
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Koester
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Landenburger
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tillie Hidalgo Lima
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moorhead
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Peterman
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Schaeffer
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Sweeney, MD
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Votruba
Represented By: Christopher B. Markus
Represented By: Dennis P. Kennedy
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?