Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lazy Fox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corp., House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Universal Music MGB NA, LLC doing business as Universal Music Careers
Defendant: Lazy Fox, Inc. doing business as KJ's also known as KJ's Pub also known as KJ's Sports Pub also known as KJ's Tiki Hut, KJ and Kay Lee
Case Number: 2:2022cv00068
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO April Wimberg re #7 Notice of Filing of Proof of Service Upon Defendants. Error: This is a Notice and a FRCO 7.1 Disclosure Statement. The document was filed only as a Notice when the document should be filed as two separate entries; Entry by attorney; Clerk re-filed the document as a FRC 7/1 Disclosure Statement #8 . In the future, when filing multiple documents within one filing, please refer to the ECF User Manual 'Filing Other Types of Documents' for the correct procedure. No further steps required by counsel. cc: COR(ECO) Modified text on 7/5/2022 (ECO).
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings Ltd, Other Affiliate Pershing Square Holdings, Other Affiliate Vivendi SA for Universal Music MGB NA, LLC; Other Affiliate Sony Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (ECO) Modified text on 7/5/2022 (ECO) (Filed per QC DE #7 ).
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1,, OF PROOF OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS (Wimberg, April)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (ECO)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kay Lee; KJ's Pub Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Lazy Fox, Inc., Kay Lee, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Corporate Parent Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Corporate Parent Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Corporate Parent House of Cash, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Interior Music Corp., Kay Lee, Lazy Fox, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC.. (ECO)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5272957), filed by Interior Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA, LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., House of Cash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Kay Lee, #4 Summons KJ's Pub)(ECO)
May 23, 2022 Conflict Check run. (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lazy Fox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazy Fox, Inc. doing business as KJ's also known as KJ's Pub also known as KJ's Sports Pub also known as KJ's Tiki Hut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp.
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA, LLC doing business as Universal Music Careers
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?