BA v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DJEYNABA BA
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, WSE Management, LLC, Wal-Mart Realty Company and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Case Number: 2:2023cv00115
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #8 Joint Status Report. (SLG)
October 2, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report - October by WSE Management, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc.. (Waldrop, Joshua)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Within 14 days, the parties must exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1) which has not been previously exchanged. These disclosures need not be filed in the record. (2) No later than February 1, 2024, the plaintiffs are directed to disclose the identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial and written reports by the expert witnesses. (3) Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due within thirty days of the discovery of new information, but by no later than thirty days prior to the close of discovery. (4) No later than April 30, 2024, the parties are directed to complete all discovery (with discovery requests served in a manner calculated for responses compliant with this deadline). (5) All discovery disputes are referred to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to standing orders of the Court. (6) All motions for extensions of time will be referred to the undersigned for disposition. (7) The parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order. Likewise, the parties may not, by agreement, extend any deadline for responding to motions. (8) No later than January 5, 2024, the parties are directed to file any motions to amend pleadings and/or join additional parties. (9) No later than May 30, 2024, the parties are directed to file all dispositive motions and Daubert motions. (10) No later than September 3, 2024, counsel are directed to file, submit to the Courts chambers, and provide to opposing counsel, the following: (see a-c). (11) No later than September 3, 2024, counsel are directed to pre-mark and number all exhibits. (12) No later than September 10, 2024, counsel are directed to file with the Clerk, submit to the Court, and provide to opposing counsel, any objections to the use of depositions or to the admissibility of exhibits. (13) The above listed pretrial filings may be submitted to the undersigned. (14) No later than September 10, 2024, the parties are directed to submit to the Court's chambers a copy of each exhibit. (15) This action is assigned for a JURY TRIAL on Tuesday, 10/8/2024, beginning at 9:00 a.m., at the United States Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky, with counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m. The estimated length of trial is three days. (16) The parties may request a pretrial conference as appropriate closer to the trial date. (17) The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month. (18) The parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. (See order for further details) Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on 09/19/2023.(SLG)cc: COR and Daniel C. Braun
September 19, 2023 Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith added. (SLG)
September 19, 2023 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SLG)
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams, Jennifer)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 30 days, counsel for the parties are directed to conduct the meeting required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel must exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, must make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than 10 days after the meeting, counsel are directed to file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. The parties should contemplate a trial date within 12 months or less. The report must include the following information: (See a thru i). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag)(ECO)cc: COR
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WSE Management, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Realty Company; Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for WSE Management, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (ECO)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00229. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5638705), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, WSE Management, LLC, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Interrogatory Answers, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)
August 31, 2023 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
August 31, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WSE Management, LLC, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Filed as part of State Court Record DE #1 , Attachment 2-Exhibit B-State Court Record Pages 40 of 123). (ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BA v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJEYNABA BA
Represented By: Aaron Michael Williams
Represented By: Daniel C. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Represented By: Joshua Francesco Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Represented By: Joshua Francesco Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Management, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Represented By: Joshua Francesco Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Realty Company
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Represented By: Joshua Francesco Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Represented By: Joshua Francesco Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?