Hernandez v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hernandez
Defendant: 3M Company, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EIDP,Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Chemdesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Dowdupont, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Dynax Corporation and E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00075
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 15 Summons Returned by Elizabeth Hernandez SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to as to UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (TBB)
June 14, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Dynax Corporation, filed by Elizabeth Hernandez. (SLG) Modified text on 6/17/2024 (TJG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2024: #1 envelope) (TJG).
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 Summons Returned by Elizabeth Hernandez SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to as to AGC Chemicals Americas Inc. served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (TJG)
June 7, 2024 Filing 12 Summons Returned by Elizabeth Hernandez SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to as to Chemdesign Products, Inc. served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (TJG)
June 7, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Returned by Elizabeth Hernandez SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to as to Chemguard, Inc. served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (TJG)
May 23, 2024 Clerk's Note: Case transferred from Kentucky Eastern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:24-cv-03155, filed 05/22/2024. (SLG)
May 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTE re #10 : Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina using CM/ECF. (TDA)
May 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTE: JPMDL information extracted re #10 case transferred to MDL and electronically transmitted to AO. (TDA)
May 21, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFIED ORDER received from District of South Carolina re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 190 filed in MDL Case Number 2873. (SLG)cc: COR
May 21, 2024 Filing 9 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2873 (SLG)
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURN re #5 Summons Issued/Reissued. (SLG)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Chemguard, Inc., filed by Elizabeth Hernandez. (SLG)
May 6, 2024 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Mark E. Yonts: It appears the address listed on your filing #1 Complaint is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (TBB)
May 6, 2024 Conflict Check run. (TBB)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; INCORRECT re #3 Summons Issued/Reissued, ; Correct document attached to this entry. *TJG* cc: COR (TJG)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Chemdesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (including attested copies of the complaint and certified mail return receipts) for service through Kentucky Secretary of State and ready for pick up at the Office of the Clerk. (TJG)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TBB)cc: COR
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as Defendants Clariant Corp., Corteva, Inc., EIDP, Inc., Kidde-Fenway, 3M Co., Arkema, Inc., BASF Corp., Carrier Corp., The Chemnours Co. FC, LLC, The Chemours Co. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (TBB) (TJG). Modified text on 5/6/2024 (TJG).
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5830490), filed by Elizabeth Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(TBB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIDP,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemdesign Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdupont, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel J. Urbon
Represented By: Mark Edward Yonts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?