Padgett v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Padgett, II
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance and LM General
Case Number: 2:2025cv00008
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 3/19/2025 at 11:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Counsel shall connect five minutes before call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/11/2025.(TJG)cc: COR, Cov Diary
February 25, 2025 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT OF Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kenneth P. Padgett, II. (Grubbs, Margo) Modified text on 2/25/2025 (TJG).
February 25, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #11 Joint Report of Planning Meeting (TJG)
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. The Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel #8 is hereby also construed as a Motion to Substitute Counsel, to be docketed accordingly. As also so construed, the Motion to Substitute Counsel #8 is hereby denied without prejudice. 2. Should Attorney Padgett wish to withdraw from this action, he must file a motion to withdraw that complies with Joint Local Rule 83.6. But until such a motion is filed, Attorney Padgett remains as co-counsel of record on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 02/12/2025. (SLG)cc: COR
February 11, 2025 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTPLAINTIFF by Kenneth P. Padgett, II. (Grubbs, Margo)
February 7, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL by Kenneth P. Padgett, II APPEARANCE AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (Grubbs, Margo) Modified text on 2/12/2025 (SLG).
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties, or, if represented by counsel, through their counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, andthe possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: (See ORDER a-e.) 3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form) (TBB) cc: COR
January 23, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (TBB)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a Disclosure Statement that complies with Rule 7.1(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days following the date of this Order, the same being not later than February 5, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/22/2025. (TBB) cc: COR
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Haara, Laura)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011. (WHP) cc: COR
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LM General Insurance Company. (WHP)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-02608. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6013412), filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHP)
January 17, 2025 Conflict Check run. (WHP)
January 17, 2025 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Kenneth Patrick Padgett: An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Patrick Padgett (WHP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura M. Haara
Represented By: John Kendrick Wells, IV
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Laura M. Haara
Represented By: John Kendrick Wells, IV
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General
Represented By: Laura M. Haara
Represented By: John Kendrick Wells, IV
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Padgett, II
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Padgett
Represented By: Margo L. Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?