Steedman, v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kathleen Steedman
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2025cv00010
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures on or before March 31, 2025. (2) Motion to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings; For the Plaintiff on or before August 30, 2025, For the Defendant on or before September 30, 2025. (3) Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports; For the Plaintiff on or before December 31, 2025, For the Defendant on or before February 27, 2026. (4) Fact Discovery on or before August 31, 2025. (5) Expert Discovery on or before April 30, 2026. (6) Status Report on or before November 28, 2025 (close of all discovery). (7) Dispositive or Daubert Motions on or before May 1, 2026. (8) Copies of Memoranda A courtesy copy of briefs and memoranda in support of motions must be provided to Chambers within 48 hours of electronic filing. Signed by Chief District Judge David L Bunning on 3/5/2025.(TDB)cc: COR
March 4, 2025 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Banks, Darrin)
February 27, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (TDB)
February 26, 2025 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Banks, Darrin)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: that the parties shall file a joint status report within 7 days, i.e., by March 4, 2025, addressing the requirements of Judge Bunning's January 23 Order or otherwise explaining why they are unable to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/25/2025.(TDB)cc: COR
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT:(1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of the entry of this Order, the parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses, and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: SEE ORDER a-e. (3) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for the purposes of setting out its Scheduling Order or other appropriate Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(TDB)cc: COR
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011. (WHP) cc: COR
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure 7.1(a)(2))(WHP)
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-02654. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6015405), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHP)
January 22, 2025 Conflict Check run. (WHP)
January 22, 2025 ANSWER to Complaint filed in State Court Record see #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (WHP)
January 22, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: Answer to Complaint (WHP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steedman, v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Steedman
Represented By: Delana S. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Fayth Disney
Represented By: Darrin Winn Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?