Rose v. Shelby County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: |
Danielle Rose and Alicia Quire |
Defendant: |
Shelby County, Kentucky, Bobby Waits, Tony Aldridge, Larry Donovan, Richard Fultz and Jason Quijas |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00097 |
Filed: |
November 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Frankfort Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory F. VanTatenhove |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 19, 2023 |
Filing
280
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [R. 267 ; R. 268 ; R. 269 ] are GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff's claims in this matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute; and, 3. Defendant Votaw's pending Motion to Compel [R. 231 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 1/18/2023.(JJ)cc: COR, Donnita Robinson via US Mail
|
September 21, 2022 |
Filing
244
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Motion to Bifurcate 225 is GRANTED 2. Final PTC and Jury Trial a to Plaintiffs Quire and Castillo SHALL f=go forward as scheduled 3. Final PTC and Jury Trial as to Plaintiff Robinson are CONTINUED GENERALLY to be rescheduled following resolution of the pending Motion to Compel 231 4. Clerk to serve copy of this Order on Ms. Robinson at her last known address as provided to the Court 243 5. Robinson ORDERED to informa Court w/in 30 days of service of this order whether she intends to proceed pro se or obtain new counsel. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/21/2022.(CBD)cc: COR
|
September 15, 2022 |
Filing
237
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: the clerk is directed to STRIKE the Order entered in this matter at Docket Entry 236 . Counsel shall disregard the Order as unnecessary in light of the Response 234 and the Court's subsequent Order 235 . Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/15/2022.(CBD)cc: COR
|
December 13, 2021 |
Filing
217
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to exclude evidence that Robinson offered to pay a cellmate for testimony [R. 195 at 5-6] is DENIED; 2. The Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate [R. 196 ] is DENIED, and; 3. TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. The parties should be prepared to discuss potential trial dates. To join the teleconference, the parties are directed to call AT&T Teleconferencing at and enter Access Code (followed by #), and, when requested, enter the Security Code (followed by #). Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 12/13/2021.(JJ)cc: COR,Fkt Modified text on 12/13/2021 (JJ).
|
May 11, 2020 |
Filing
149
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 145 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 2) Plas' intentional infliction of emotional distress claims against each of the individual Shelby County Defendants, as set fo rth in Count VII of the Third Amended Complaint, are DISMISSED. 3) Plas' negligence claims against Defendants Donovan and Foltmann, as set forth in Count VI of the Third Amended Complaint, are DISMISSED. 4) Plas' negligence claims against Defendants Waits and Aldridge, as set forthin Count VI of the Third Amended Complaint, remain. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/11/2020. (SCD)cc: COR
|
March 11, 2020 |
Filing
141
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 118 Motion to Exclude is DENIED AS MOOT. 2) 119 Motion to Exclude is DENIED. 3) 120 Motion to Exclude is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/11/2020. (SCD)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?