Jointer v. Franklin County Regional Jail et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Bey and Jerome Jointer
Defendant: Franklin County Regional Jail, John or Jane Does, Lt. D. Miller and Lt. McKeehin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00063
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #10 Affidavit of Financial Statement, #9 Complaint (Referred) (CBD)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Statement by Jerome Jointer, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT referred to PSO., filed by Jerome Jointer, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Note and Returned Envelope, #2 Envelope)(CBD)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Bey's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is GRANTED. 2. The initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), and payment of such fee is therefore DEFERRED; 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Bey's name for receipt of the filing fee. 4. Each month Bey's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of Bey's income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2); 5. Bey's complaint is DISMISSED; and 6. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKY 525) (CBD)cc: Bey, FCRJ, Finance
January 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome Jointer (CBD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jerome Jointer, pro se. (Envelope @ #6 ) (CBD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome Jointer, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jerome Bey re #3 Pro Se Information Packet. Packet was placed back in the mail to Jerome Jointer with the Order at DE #4 . (SCD)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send Bey an EDKY Form 520, thoroughly complete and return to the Court if he wishes to proceed with a federal action. 2) The Clerk of the Court is further DIRECTED to send Bey a Form AO-240 and an EDKY Form 523. 3) Should Bey wish to pursue this case, he must either pay the $350 filing fee and $50 admin fee or (1) have the EDKy Form 523 certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Form AO-240, and (3) file both of these documents with this Court. 4) Take these steps w/in 30 days or the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/26/2018.(SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla via US Mail w forms
November 14, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (CBD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(CBD) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2018) (CBD).
November 14, 2018 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge PSO, filed by Jerome Bey, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env)(CBD) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (CBD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jointer v. Franklin County Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McKeehin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Jointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?