Jackson v. Stark et al

Plaintiff: Mark A. Jackson
Defendant: R. Leslie Knight, Laman L. Stark and KY. State Police Post 5
Case Number: 3:2019cv00005
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Mark A. Jackson re #11 Letter: A courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. If you would like a copy of any document previously filed in your record, please send a request to the Office of the Clerk noting the docket entry number for each copy requested. You will receive a response advising you of the total number of pages and the amount of money required to obtain the requested copies. Copies of the documents in your record will require a pre-payment of 50 cents per page.Please find enclosed a free copy of the 42 USC 1983 form in response to your request. cc: Mark A. Jackson by US Mail (SCD)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Mark Jackson (Pro Se) requesting copy of docket sheet and 42 USC packet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope (Postmark 3/13/2019)) (SCD)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Little Sandy. Mail sent to Mark A. Jackson. NOTE: Due to clerical error incorrect address was used. Copy of #6 , #8 and #9 and mailed to Jackson at corrected address at Kentucky State Reformatory (CBD)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2) Payment of fee is DEFERRED. 3) Clerk shall open an acct in Jackson's name. Clerk shall complete a Form EDKy 525. Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and form upon Jailer/Warden and Office of General Counsel for Dept of Corrections in Frankfort, KY. 4) Each month, send Clerk a payment. Shall continue until entire fee is paid. 5) Jackson must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in mailing address. 6) Matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525 Form) (SCD)cc: F,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail), Warden(via US Mail w form), Office of General Counsel(via US Mail w form)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Caption Page)(CBD)
January 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00813. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Jackson w/ copy of docket sheet. Modified cc on 1/18/2019 (CBD).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/16/2019 Dismissing Case. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division at Frankfort, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc:counsel, KYED, Pro Se Plaintiff (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 1/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark A. Jackson (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark A. Jackson (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KY. State Police Post 5, R. Leslie Knight, Laman L. Stark, filed by Mark A. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Stark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Leslie Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laman L. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY. State Police Post 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?