Messer et al v. Quality Care for Kids, LLC
Plaintiff: Sharon Messer and Julie Gray
Defendant: Quality Care for Kids, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00010
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (CBD)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moore, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Stipulation of Extension of Time #9 is GRANTED and the Defendant will respond to the Motion #4 in no less than 21 days following the entry of a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/18/2019.(CBD)cc: COR
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is ordered that the #6 Stipulation is GRANTED and the Dft has up to and including 3/14/2019 to move answer or otherwise respond to Pla's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/13/2019.(SCD)cc: COR
March 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs and Appointment of Interim Collective Counsel (SCD)
March 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #10 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint (SCD)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quality Care for Kids, LLC.(Moore, Robert)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs and Appointment of Interim Collective Counsel by Quality Care for Kids, LLC, Julie Gray, Sharon Messer. (Moore, Robert) Modified on 3/13/2019 (SCD).
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quality Care for Kids, LLC. (Moore, Robert)
March 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION to Certify Class by Julie Gray, Sharon Messer (Conditional Certification) (CBD)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Moore. #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT has been filed by Quality Care for Kids, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
March 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (SCD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Quality Care for Kids, LLC., Sharon Messer, Julie Gray. (Moore, Robert) Modified on 3/8/2019 (SCD).
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING of Proof of Service of Summons as to Defendant Quality Care for Kids, LLC by certified mail on 2/14/2019 by Julie Gray, Sharon Messer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Lockaby, Matthew) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (CBD).
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Julie Gray, Sharon Messer (Conditional Certification) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Messer Personal Earnings Statement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Messer and Gray Personal Earnings Statements, #4 Exhibit 3 - Messer and Gray Personal Earnings Statements, #5 Exhibit 4 - Messer and Gray Bank Statements, #6 Exhibit 5 - Messer and Gray Bonus Payments, #7 Exhibit 6 - Crawford v. LFUCG, #8 Exhibit 7 - Hathaway v. Shawn Jones Masonry, #9 Exhibit 8 - Douglas v. GE, #10 Exhibit 9 - Ross v. Jack Rabbit, #11 Exhibit 10 - Shipes v. Amurcon, #12 Exhibit 11 - LaFleur v. Dollar Tree, #13 Exhibit 12 - Proposed Notice of Collective Action, #14 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lockaby, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Quality Care for Kids, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
February 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4283205), filed by Sharon Messer, Julie Gray. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messer et al v. Quality Care for Kids, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Messer
Represented By: Matthew T. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Gray
Represented By: Matthew T. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Care for Kids, LLC
Represented By: Chadwick Aaron McTighe
Represented By: Robert C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?