Jeffery v. Medical Protective Company
Plaintiff: Michaela Jeffery
Defendant: Medical Protective Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00023
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Agreed Motion #10 is GRANTED. Ms. Jeffery shall have up to and including 7/26/2019 to file her response to Defendant's Motion #9 . Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/8/2019.(CBD)cc: COR
July 5, 2019 Clerk's Note: Bar check entry docketed this date was entered in error has been deleted. (CBD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Medical Protective Company by Michaela Jeffery (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kemper, William) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (CBD).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Medical Protective Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cover letter from MedPro, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 15, 2014 letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - May 12, 2014 letter to Alfred Welsh, #5 Exhibit 5 - May 12, 2014 letter to Dr. Justin Clemens, #6 Exhibit 6 - May 29, 2014 letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - Certified Mail Receipt, #8 Exhibit 8 - July 8, 2014 letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - July 11, 2014 letter, #10 Exhibit 10 - August 5, 2014 letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - August 28, 2014 email, #12 Exhibit 12 - October 20, 2014 letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - Docket Sheet, #14 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO William Aaron Kemper: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #8 Scheduling Order. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, William Aaron Kemper by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (SCD)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1)(a) Initial disclosures exchanged by 6/4/2019. (b) Fact discovery completed by 10/14/2019. 2) Observe directives re filing of discovery unless Court otherwise orders (see order). 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved first meet, telephone conf w Magistrate Judge, file motions. Have to and including 4/1/2020 to file dispositive motions, motions in limine and Daubert motions. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT. NLT 5/1/2020, file pretrial filings. NLT 5/15/2020 file objections. JURY TRIAL set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT (3-4 days), counsel arrive by 9:30 AM. Requests to modify this order shall be submitted upon motion prior to expiration of deadline. It is further ordered that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for discovery & pretrial proceeding. Dispositive motions referred to District Judge. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/17/2019.(SCD)cc: COR
May 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Joint Status Report (SCD)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Medical Protective Company, Michaela Jeffrey. (Barfield, Mindy) Modified on 5/17/2019 (SCD).
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mindy G. Barfield (Barfield, Mindy)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR
April 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
April 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (CBD)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Medical Protective Company. (CBD)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medical Protective Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Medical Protective Company.. (CBD)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-267 ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4328838), filed by Medical Protective Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffery v. Medical Protective Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Jeffery
Represented By: Alfred J. Welsh
Represented By: Aaron Kemper
Represented By: William Aaron Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Protective Company
Represented By: Mindy G. Barfield
Represented By: Shadette Page Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?