Humphrey v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Torrie Humphrey
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join parties or amend pleadings (for all parties) due by 10/11/2019. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Expert Witness Disclosure due from by Plaintiff and from Defendant by 1/17/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/27/2020. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. JURY TRIAL set for 6/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Counsel shall be in court at 8:30 a.m. The anticipated length of trial is four (4) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 6/12/2019.(CBD)cc: COR, D
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (re #11 Notice, Consent and Reference to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge): It is ordered this case is referred to a US Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. (Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins.) Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/10/2019.(SCD)cc: COR
June 10, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and #11 Notice Consent & Reference to Magistrate Judge (CBD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company Notice Consent & Reference to Magistrate Judge (Stanley, Christine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stanley, Christine)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Torrie Humphrey.(Scott, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES re FRCP 26(a)(1): by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (UCSPA Claim).(Stanley, Christine) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (CBD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES per Rule 26(a)(1), by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(UIM Claim) .(Dawson, Douglas) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (CBD).
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: all documents were not uploaded re #5 Order For Meeting and Report; All documents have been attached to this entry. cc: COR (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/1/2019.(CBD)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Consent Form) (CBD).
April 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Van Tatenhove for review and possible scheduling: #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Amended Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (CBD)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Notice of Removal #1 indicates a pending Motion for Summary Judgment filed in state court by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Accordingly, and the Court being sufficiently advised, it is hereby ORDERED that Parties SHALL REFILE any pending motions in the record separately and in compliance with the Joint Local Rules. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/24/2019. (CBD)cc: COR
April 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
April 12, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company Filed at #1 -1 NOR as part of the State Court Record (CBD)
April 12, 2019 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Torrie Humphrey by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Filed at #1 -1 NOR as part of the State Court Record(CBD)
April 12, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Torrie Humphrey. Filed at #1 -1 NOR as part of the State Court Record(CBD)
April 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Filed at #1 -1 NOR as part of the State Court Record (CBD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (CBD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shelby Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00470 ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4334229), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrie Humphrey
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: David Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Douglas P. Dawson
Represented By: Joshua J. Leckrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?