Garrett v. Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jenna Garrett
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC and World Finance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is ordered that Pla's claims against Dft Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear his, her or its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed to by the parties. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/10/2019.(SCD)cc: COR
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Thanh-Thuy T. Luong is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/10/2019. (SCD)cc: COR
June 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #14 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal re Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation (SCD)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal re Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation by Jenna Garrett and Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation. (Hemminger, David) Modified on 6/5/2019 (SCD).
May 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant World Finance Corporation (SCD)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant World Finance Corporation by Jenna Garrett (Hemminger, David) Modified on 5/23/2019 (SCD).
May 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #11 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (SCD)
May 21, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Thanh-Thuy T. Luong re #11 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (SCD)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Margaret Brannon re #11 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Affidavit," "Supplement." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (SCD)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is ordered that the #6 Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond is GRANTED and Dft Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation shall have to and including 6/6/2019 to file said response. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/17/2019.(SCD)cc: COR
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4363287) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thanh-Thuy T. Luong, #2 Supplement - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Margaret) Modified on 5/21/2019 (SCD).
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Brannon, Margaret)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Brannon, Margaret)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Jansen, Sandra)
May 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation giving Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation to 6/6/2019 to respond (CBD)
May 1, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Jeffrey Steven Moad for Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation added. (CBD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation. (Moad, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation giving Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation to 6/6/2019 to respond. (Moad, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (CBD).
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Jansen, Sandra)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Davis Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation, Trans Union, LLC, World Finance Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service by Certified Mail. (CBD)
April 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4335418), filed by Jenna Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ky Higher Education Student Loans, #3 Summons Worlf Finance, #4 Summons Equifax, #5 Summons Trans Union, #6 Summons Experian)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Davis Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Thanh-Thuy T. Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Garrett
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?