Lyons et al v. Franklin County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: April Lyons
Defendant: Lane Crawley, Phillip Ray, Jason Sherrow, Edward Hunt, Pat Melton, Franklin County Sheriffs Office, Jeremy Younger and Franklin County, Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to an including 10/28/2019 to file its Response to Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/21/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
October 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (SCD)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Lane Crawley, Lane Crawley, Franklin County Sheriffs Office, Franklin County, Kentucky, Edward Hunt, Edward Hunt, April Lyons, Pat Melton, Phillip Ray, Phillip Ray, Jason Sherrow, Jason Sherrow, Jeremy Younger. (Osterloh, Morgan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Lane Crawley, Lane Crawley, Franklin County Sheriffs Office, Franklin County, Kentucky, Edward Hunt, Edward Hunt, Pat Melton, Phillip Ray, Phillip Ray, Jason Sherrow, Jason Sherrow, Jeremy Younger, Jeremy Younger Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Osterloh, Morgan)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO James E. Boyd: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #4 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Update Answer Due Deadline,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, James E. Boyd by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (CBD)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the parties joint motion #3 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including Thursday, September 26, 2019, to file their answer or responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/19/2019.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 9/19/2019 (CBD).
September 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #3 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer (SCD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by Lane Crawley, Lane Crawley, Franklin County Sheriffs Office, Franklin County, Kentucky, Edward Hunt, Edward Hunt, April Lyons, Pat Melton, Phillip Ray, Phillip Ray, Jason Sherrow, Jason Sherrow, Jeremy Younger, Jeremy Younger. (Osterloh, Morgan)
September 13, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-789 ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4463974)), filed by Jeremy Younger, Lane Crawley, Jeremy Younger, Jason Sherrow, Phillip Ray, Pat Melton, Jason Sherrow, Franklin County, Kentucky, Phillip Ray, Lane Crawley, Edward Hunt, Edward Hunt, Franklin County Sheriffs Office. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record - Complaint, #3 State Court Record - Docket Sheet)(CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons et al v. Franklin County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Crawley
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Ray
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Sherrow
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Hunt
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Melton
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Younger
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County, Kentucky
Represented By: Morgan Todd Osterloh
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Lyons
Represented By: James E. Boyd
Represented By: Robert Andrew Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?