Discovery Schools, Inc. v. Radio ID Equipment Inc.
Plaintiff: Discovery Schools, Inc.
Defendant: Radio ID Equipment Inc. doing business as CarRiderPro
Case Number: 3:2020cv00063
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the #14 Proposed Agreed Order is GRANTED. Dft shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/21/2020.(SCD)cc: COR
October 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #14 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint (SCD)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Radio ID Equipment Inc., Discovery Schools, Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin) Modified on 10/21/2020 (SCD).
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Radio ID Equipment Inc.. (Duncan, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Keith Chevalier on 10/01/2020, filed by Discovery Schools, Inc.. (Brown, Alexander)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kevin Duncan. #10 Notice of Appearance has been filed by Radio ID Equipment Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Todd Duncan on behalf of Radio ID Equipment Inc. (Duncan, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiff's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #6 ; R. #8 ] are GRANTED; 2. Alexander D. Brown is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff Discovery Schools, Inc. in the above styled action; and 3. Robert C. Kain, Jr. is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff Discovery Schools, Inc. in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 8/31/2020. (JJ)cc: COR, Alexander Brown & Robert Kain w/ ECF Registration Forms by US Mail Modified text on 8/31/2020 (JJ).
August 28, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 FIRST MOTION for Alexander Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and, #8 FIRST MOTION for Robert Kain to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Discovery Schools, Inc. (SCD)
August 28, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Robert C. Kain, Jr re #8 FIRST MOTION for Robert Kain to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Discovery Schools, Inc. (SCD)
August 28, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Alexander D. Brown re #6 FIRST MOTION for Alexander Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Discovery Schools, Inc. (SCD)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Robert Kain to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Discovery Schools, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4760210) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kain affidavit, #2 Exhibit Florida Bar records, #3 Proposed Order)(Graves, Trevor)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Alexander Brown by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION for Alexander Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Discovery Schools, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4760193) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brown affidavit, #2 Exhibit Florida Bar record, #3 Proposed Order)(Graves, Trevor)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Radio ID Equipment Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Discovery Schools, Inc.. (Graves, Trevor)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (CBD)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4758816), filed by Discovery Schools, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,129,239, #3 Exhibit B - Patent Assignment, #4 Exhibit C - Secretary of State page, #5 Exhibit D - Video excerpts, #6 Summons)(CBD)
August 26, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discovery Schools, Inc. v. Radio ID Equipment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio ID Equipment Inc. doing business as CarRiderPro
Represented By: Kevin Todd Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Schools, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor T. Graves
Represented By: Alexander D. Brown
Represented By: Robert C. Kain, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew D. Dorisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?