Mooney v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marchelle Mooney
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 and AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00066
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, LaToi D. Mayo. Answer to Complaint #6 has been filed by AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Mayo, LaToi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marchelle Mooney via certified return receipt mail to (Allison, Karl)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Karl Allison re #4 Summons Returned Executed; a blank summons was attached as the Main Document. Within 7 calendar days, file the summons issued by the Clerk with the completed declaration of service, which states the method of service, as an electronic attachment to a document entitled Notice of Filing. cc: COR (JJ)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marchelle Mooney via certified return receipt mail to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (Allison, Karl)
September 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service by Certified Mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons AT&T Services, #2 Summons AT&T Umbrella Plan)(JJ)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4778651), filed by Marchelle Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sedgwick, #3 Summons AT&T Services, #4 Summons AT&T Umbrella Plan)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marchelle Mooney
Represented By: Karl Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?