Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kristi G Bailey
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00067
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Nicholas Rocco Farnolo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info)(CBD)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY of TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH) re MDL No. 2641: In an updated report on the settlement status of cases, the parties identify more than 100 pending cases that are not likely to settle. (Filed as Docs. 21552 at 2, 21552-2 in USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641). These cases which were directly filed in the MDL will be transferred to appropriate districts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Signed by Senior Judge David G. Campbell on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified copy of Master Case USDC AZD 2:15-md-2641 Docket Sheet) NOTE: Please see attached Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to the MDL and this case. (CBD)cc: COR
September 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:17-cv-04029. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. CC: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to any non-registered filer(s)
September 17, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4029-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14819829 filed by Kristi G Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi G Bailey
Represented By: Nicholas Rocco Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?