Manns v. Woodforest GP, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Derek Manns
Defendant: Woodforest GP, LLC and Woodforest National Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00070
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Woodforest National Bank. (Martin, Ryan)
November 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Woodforest National Bank (CBD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Woodforest National Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, Ryan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodforest National Bank. (Martin, Ryan) Modified text on 10/5/2020 (JJ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Ryan M. Martin. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Woodforest National Bank without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ)
October 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00732. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4791466), filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court), #3 Exhibit C - Declaration W. Jeffrey Levi, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manns v. Woodforest GP, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodforest GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodforest National Bank
Represented By: Ryan M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Manns
Represented By: Kamp Townsend Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?