Kentucky et al v. Yellen et al
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky, Tennessee, State of and State of Tennessee
Defendant: Janet Yellen, U.S. Department of Treasury and Richard K. Delmar
Amicus Curiae: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce and National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00017
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Richard K. Delmar, U.S. Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Charles)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E.T. Roberts on behalf of All Defendants (Roberts, Charles)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #21 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Richard K. Delmar, U.S. Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen (JJ)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on its own motion. Due to a scrivener's error, the Order granting Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #18 ], is hereby AMENDED to reflect that the attorney in question is named Joseph D. Henchman and not John D. Henchman. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 5/14/2021.(JJ)cc: COR
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER:1) Mr. Henchman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #15 ] is GRANTED; and 2) Attorney John D. Henchman is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for amici curiae National Taxpayers Union Foundation in the present action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 5/13/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and John D. Henchman w/ECF Registration Form by US Mail
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1) Ms. Murphy's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #16 ] is GRANTED; and 2) Attorney Erin Murphy is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for amici curiae United States Chamber of Commerce and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in the present action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 5/13/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and Erin Murphy w/ECF Registration Form by US Mail
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Admission List, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Receipt 3002517)(JJ)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Joseph D. Henchman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Taxpayers Union Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt 5032238, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(JJ)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Joseph D. Henchman re #15 MOTION for Joseph D. Henchman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Taxpayers Union Foundation. (JJ)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #16 MOTION for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce, #15 MOTION for Joseph D. Henchman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Taxpayers Union Foundation (JJ)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Erin E. Murphy re #16 MOTION for Erin E. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce. (JJ)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) Mr. Clement's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #13 ] is GRANTED; and 2) Attorney Paul Clement is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for amici curiae United States Chamber of Commerce and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in the present action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 5/10/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and Paul Clement w/ ECF Registration Form by US Mail
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Paul D. Clement re #13 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce. (JJ)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #13 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce (JJ)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, United States Chamber of Commerce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Receipt 3002507)(JJ)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1) The Plaintiff's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R.'s #7 , #8 , #9 ] are GRANTED; and 2) Attorneys Andre S. Blumstein, Sarah K. Campbell, and Brandon J. Smith are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff State of Tennessee in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 4/15/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and Andree S. Blumstein, Brandon J. Smith and Sarah K. Campbell w/ECF Registration Form by US Mail
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE Filing fees received - Andree Blumstein, Brandon Smith and Sarah Campbell re Motion #7 , #8 and #9 - $ 125.00 each, receipt numbers 5032086, 5032087 and 5032088 (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Brandon J Smith, #2 Receipt for Sarah K. Campbell) (CBD)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 MOTION for Andree S. Blumstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 MOTION for Brandon J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Sarah K. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of service by Brett Robert Nolan on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Nolan, Brett)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Order by Tennessee, State of Smith motion for admission pro hac vice Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ECF Registration, #2 Attachment Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nolan, Brett) Modified mtn type on 4/8/2021 (CBD). Modified on 4/8/2021 (JJ).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Order by Tennessee, State of Campbell motion for admission pro hac vice Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ECF Registration, #2 Attachment Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nolan, Brett) Modified mtn type on 4/8/2021 (CBD). Modified on 4/8/2021 (JJ).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Order by Tennessee, State of Blumstein motion for admission pro hac vice Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ECF Registration, #2 Attachment Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nolan, Brett) Modified mtn type on 4/8/2021 (CBD). Modified on 4/8/2021 (JJ).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Note : Counsel called to advise a check for PHV Motions #7 , #8 and #9 has been mailed to the Clerk. (CBD)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andree S. Blumstein, Sarah K. Campbell, Brandon J. Smith re #9 MOTION for Brandon Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Sarah Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #7 MOTION for Andree Blumstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (JJ)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sarah K. Campbell by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brandon J. Smith by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andree S. Blumstein by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richard K. Delmar, U.S. Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel (Attachments: #1 Summons Richard K. Delmar, #2 Summons U. S. Department of Treasury, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(JJ)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4940113), filed by State of Tennessee, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/16/21 Letter from States, #2 Exhibit B - 3/23/21 Letter from Sec. Yellen, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Janet Yellen, #5 Summons Richard K. Delmar, #6 Summons U.S. Department of Treasury, #7 Summons US Attorney, #8 Summons US Attorney General)(JJ)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentucky et al v. Yellen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Victor B. Maddox
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: Barry L. Dunn
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee, State of
Represented By: Brandon J. Smith
Represented By: Sarah K. Campbell
Represented By: Andree S. Blumstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Brandon J. Smith
Represented By: Sarah K. Campbell
Represented By: Andree S. Blumstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K. Delmar
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Represented By: Joseph D. Henchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?