Qiu v. Anderson County High School et al
Plaintiff: Wei Qiu
Defendant: Anderson County High School and Anderson County Schools
Case Number: 3:2021cv00027
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
2 Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Anderson County High School, Anderson County Schools , MOTION to Dismiss by Anderson County High School, Anderson County Schools for Insufficient Process and Insufficient Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chenoweth, Grant)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wei Qiu via Certified Mail to Anderson County Schools served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Returned Receipt, #2 USPS Receipt/Tracking)(JJ)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter be reassigned to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/13/2021.(JJ)cc: COR and Wei Qui by US Mail
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Wei Qiu, pro se, re #1 Complaint. (JJ)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case no longer referred to PSO per JMH Chambers. (JJ)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. (JJ)cc: COR and Wei Qiu by US Mail
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Motion Sample)(JJ)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anderson County Schools; Summons issued and returned to pro se via pick-up from Office of Clerk (JJ)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 3002562), filed by Wei Qiu, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Summons, #4 Receipt)(JJ)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qiu v. Anderson County High School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Qiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County High School
Represented By: Grant R. Chenoweth
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County Schools
Represented By: Grant R. Chenoweth
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?