Taylor et al v. KKR & Co., L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Tia Taylor, Ashley Hall-Nagy and Bobby Estes
Defendant: KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Blackstone Group, Inc., Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Jane Buchan, R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, Ice Miller, LLP, William S. Cook, Michael Rudzik and KKR & Co. Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Daniel Cameron
Case Number: 3:2021cv00029
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, J. Tomilson Hill, Ice Miller, LLP, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Girish Reddy, George R. Roberts, Michael Rudzik, Stephen A. Schwarzman (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Sur-reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Edelman, Barbara)
September 22, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE: All parties and counsel are hereby notified that the undersigned's stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/2021.(JJ)cc: COR
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned hereby exercises his discretion to recuse from the above-styled action. General Order No. 19-07 indicates that, in the event of the undersigneds recusal from a Frankfort civil matter, the case will be reassigned to Judge Caldwell. See Gen. Order No. 19-07 at 3. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that all further proceedings in this case shall be reassigned pursuant to the guidelines set forth in the General Order and as stated above. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/22/2021.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 9/22/2021 (CBD).
September 16, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Alexander S. Zolan: re #62 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A PHV e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Alexander S. Zolan (CBD)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: 1. Motion #61 is GRANTED. 2. Alexander S. Zolan is admitted Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/15/2021. (CBD)cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Alexander S. Zolan Modified cc on 9/16/2021 (CBD).
September 15, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Alexander Zolan re #61 MOTION for Alexander S. Zolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5073786). (CBD)
September 15, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #61 MOTION for Alexander S. Zolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5073786) (CBD)
September 14, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Alexander S. Zolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5073786) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit EX B - Affidavit of Alexander S. Zolan, #3 Proposed Order)(Skolnick, Cory)
September 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jeffrey Walson re #60 REPLY BRIEF; Error a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ)
September 8, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor (JJ)
September 7, 2021 Filing 60 REPLY BRIEF to #50 Response, #30 Motion to Remand filed by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Albert Y. Chang in Further Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, #3 Exhibit 9 - Order Extending Time)(Walson, Jeffrey) Modified text/link on 9/8/2021 (JJ).
September 5, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Victor B. Maddox and Christopher L. Thacker: It appears the address and or email address listed on your filing #58 AMICUS BRIEF is different than the address(es) registered with PACER. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (CBD)
September 3, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; Incorrect PDF image uploaded re #58 AMICUS BRIEF ; Correct document attached to this entry. *CBD* cc: COR (CBD)
September 3, 2021 Filing 58 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Daniel Cameron. Filed per #57 (CBD) (Main Document 58 replaced on 9/7/2021) (CBD).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: 1. The Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Briefs #49 is GRANTED; 2. The amicus brief filed by the Attorney General is deemed filed as of the date it was received; and 3. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the attached amicus brief #49 -1 in the record. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/3/2021. (CBD)cc: COR
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: 1. Parties' Agreed Order (R. #55 ) is GRANTED; 2. Court's previous order extending Dfts deadlines to respond to Plas' First Amended Complaint (R. #18 ) is VACATED; 3. Dfts shall answer or Otherwise respond to Plas First Amended Complaint w/in 30 days following entry of an order by this Court ruling on Plas' Motion to Remand (R. #30 ). Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/3/2021. (TDA) cc: COR
September 3, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Notice to Attorney Alexander Zolan - No response. (JJ)
September 2, 2021 Filing 55 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadlines to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, William S. Cook, KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Girish Reddy, George R. Roberts, Michael Rudzik, Stephen A. Schwarzman. (Edelman, Barbara)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #48 ] is GRANTED; and 2. Paul C. Curnin is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, and Michael Rudzik in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/1/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and Paul C. Curnin by US Mail
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #47 ] is GRANTED; 2. Michael S. Carnevale is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, and Michael Rudzik in the above styled action; and 3. The previous Order granting Defendants' Pro Hac Vice Motion [R. #43 ] is AMENDED to reflect that attorney David Elbaum is admitted Pro Hac Vice to additionally represent Girish Reddy. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/1/2021. (JJ)cc: COR, Michael S. Carnevale and David Elbaum by US Mail Modified on 9/3/2021 (JJ).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R.'s #39 , #40 , #41 , #42 ] are GRANTED; and 2. Brette Tannenbaum, Brad S. Karp, Andrew Ehrlich, and Lorin L. Reisner are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants Blackstone Alternative Asset Management L.P., The Blackstone Group Inc., Stephen A. Schwarzman, and J. Tomilson Hill in the above styledaction. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/1/2021. (JJ)cc: CORand Brette Tannenbaum, Brad S. Karp, Andrew Ehrlich, and Lorin L. Reisner by US Mail
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #45 ] is GRANTED; and 2. James D. Baskin is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs Tia Taylor, Ashley Hall-Nagy, and Bobby Estes in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/1/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and James D. Baskin by US Mail
August 24, 2021 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor filed by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, William S. Cook, J. Tomilson Hill, Ice Miller, LLP, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Girish Reddy, George R. Roberts, Michael Rudzik, Stephen A. Schwarzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2012 Report of the Task Force on Kentucky Public Pensions, #2 Exhibit B - KRS Statement of Investment Policy (May 2011), #3 Exhibit C - Prisma LLC Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Prisma Subscription Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - July 27, 2016 Additional Subscription Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Mayberry Compl., #7 Exhibit G - Mayberry, Mot. for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Dec. 31, 2020), #8 Exhibit H - Mayberry, Mot. to Intervene (Feb. 1, 2021), #9 Exhibit I - June 14, 2021 Order, #10 Exhibit J - Mayberry Reply Mem. In Support Mot. to Amend (Jan. 8, 2021))(Edelman, Barbara)
August 23, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #48 MOTION for Paul C. Curnin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD)
August 23, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Paul C. Curnin re #48 MOTION for Paul C. Curnin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5048215). (CBD)
August 20, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Daniel Cameron Amicus Curiae brief (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amicus Curiae brief)(Silletto, Aaron)
August 20, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Paul C. Curnin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5048215) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 17, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Michael S. Carnevale re #47 MOTION for Michael S. Carnevale to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5042839). (JJ)
August 17, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #47 MOTION for Michael S. Carnevale to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5042839) (JJ)
August 16, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Michael S. Carnevale to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5042839) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 12, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Brad S. Karp, Lorin L. Reisner, Andrew J. Ehrlich, Brette Tannenbaum, James D. Baskin re #42 MOTION for Brette Tannenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039412), #45 MOTION for James D. Baskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5040099), #39 MOTION for Lorin L. Reisner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039387), #40 MOTION for Andrew Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039395), #41 MOTION for Brad Karp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039401). (JJ)
August 12, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #39 MOTION for Lorin L. Reisner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039387), #42 MOTION for Brette Tannenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039412), #45 MOTION for James D. Baskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5040099), #40 MOTION for Andrew Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039395), #41 MOTION for Brad Karp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039401) (JJ)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #33 ] is GRANTED; and 2. Margaret A. Keeley is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Ice Miller, LLP in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/11/2021. (JJ)cc: COR and Margaret A. Keeley w/ ECF Registration Form by US Mail
August 11, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION for James D. Baskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5040099) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James D. Baskin, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Ciccarelli, Michelle)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: 1. The Defendant's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 ] are GRANTED; 2. Abigail Noebels, Steven Shepard, Ryan Weiss, and Barry Barnett are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, and George R. Roberts in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/11/2021. (JJ)cc: COR, Abigail Noebels, Steven Shepard, Ryan Weiss, and Barry Barnett w/ ECF Registration Form by US Mail
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R. #21 , #22 , #23 , #29 ] are GRANTED; 2. Michael J. Garvey, Sara A. Ricciardi, and Peter E. Kazanoff are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, and Michael Rudzik in the above styled action; and 3. 3. David Elbaum is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants Jane Buchan,Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., and Michael Rudzik in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/11/2021. (JJ)cc: COR, Michael J. Garvey, Sara A. Ricciardi, Peter E. Kazanoff and David Elbaum w/ECF Registration Form by US Mail
August 11, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Brette Tannenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039412) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Brad Karp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039401) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Andrew Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039395) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Lorin L. Reisner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5039387) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 38 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PAAMCO Prisma Holdings, LLC for Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC.. (Edelman, Barbara)
August 10, 2021 Filing 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prisma Capital Partners, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Prisma Capital Holdings, LLC for Prisma Capital Partners, L.P... (Edelman, Barbara)
August 6, 2021 Filing 36 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC. (Ames, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2021 Filing 35 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Blackstone Inc. for Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P... (White, Jordan)
August 6, 2021 Filing 34 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackstone Group, Inc.. (White, Jordan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Margaret A. Keeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5035683) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit EX B - Affidavit of Margaret A. Keeley, #3 Proposed Order)(Skolnick, Cory)
August 5, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Margaret A. Keeley re #33 MOTION for Margaret A. Keeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5035683). (JJ)
August 5, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #33 MOTION for Margaret A. Keeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ice Miller, LLP ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5035683) (JJ)
August 4, 2021 Filing 32 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ice Miller, LLP. (Skolnick, Cory)
August 4, 2021 Filing 31 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KKR & Co. Inc.. (Edelman, Barbara)
August 4, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Michelle Ciccarelli re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit 1," "Exhibit 2." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ)
August 3, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy, Tia Taylor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Albert Y. Chang in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 1- State Court Case History, #4 Exhibit 2- State Court Opinion and Order 11/30/18, #5 Exhibit 3- State Court Order 12/28/20, #6 Exhibit 4- State Court Order 6/14/21, #7 Exhibit 5- State Court Proposed Verified Complaint, #8 Exhibit 6- State Court Notice of Compliance, #9 Exhibit 7- KRS Financial Report 2020, #10 Proposed Order)(Ciccarelli, Michelle) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (JJ).
August 3, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for David Elbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033833) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 28 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc.. (Moad, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Barry Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033567) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Ryan Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033557) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Steven Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033540) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Abigail Noebels to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033534) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Peter E. Kazanoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033077) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Sara A. Ricciardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033066) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Michael J. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5033027) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Edelman, Barbara)
August 3, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #24 MOTION for Abigail Noebels to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #26 MOTION for Ryan Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #29 MOTION for David Elbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Michael Rudzik , #25 MOTION for Steven Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #27 MOTION for Barry Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #21 MOTION for Michael J. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik , #22 MOTION for Sara A. Ricciardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik , #23 MOTION for Peter E. Kazanoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik (JJ)
August 3, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Peter E. Kazanoff, Michael J. Garvey, David Elbaum, Sara A. Ricciardi, Barry Barnett, Steven Shepard, Abigail Noebels, Ryan Weiss re #24 MOTION for Abigail Noebels to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #29 MOTION for David Elbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Michael Rudzik , #22 MOTION for Sara A. Ricciardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik , #23 MOTION for Peter E. Kazanoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik , #26 MOTION for Ryan Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #25 MOTION for Steven Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #27 MOTION for Barry Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KKR & Co. Inc., Henry R. Kravis, George R. Roberts , #21 MOTION for Michael J. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Buchan, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Girish Reddy, Michael Rudzik . (JJ)
August 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Barbara B. Edelman. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman, R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Michael Rudzik, Blackstone Group, Inc., William S. Cook, Girish Reddy, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, Ice Miller, LLP, George R. Roberts without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: 1) Mr. Hall and Mr. Brazier's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R.s #16 , #17 ] are GRANTED; and 2) Attorneys Stephen Hall and Robert Brazier are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting LLC in the present action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 7/29/2021. (JJ)cc: COR, Stephen Hall and Robert Brazier w/ECF Registration Form via US Mail
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 VACATED ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Motion [R. #15 ] is GRANTED and the Defendants shall have up to and including Monday, September 20, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 7/28/2021.(JJ)cc: COR Modified text on 9/5/2021 (TDA). PER ORDER #56
July 26, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #17 MOTION for Robert Brazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025235), #15 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadlines to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, William S. Cook, J. Tomilson Hill, Ice M, #16 MOTION for Stephen Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025224) (JJ)
July 26, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Robert G. Brazier, Steven G. Hall re #16 MOTION for Stephen Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025224), #17 MOTION for Robert Brazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025235). (JJ)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Robert Brazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025235) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Robert Brazier, #2 Proposed Order)(English, Charles)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Stephen Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5025224) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Stephen Hall, #2 Proposed Order)(English, Charles)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Deadlines to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, William S. Cook, J. Tomilson Hill, Ice Miller, LLP, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Girish Reddy, George R. Roberts, Michael Rudzik, Stephen A. Schwarzman. (Edelman, Barbara)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sara A. Ricciardi by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY David Elbaum by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Michael J. Garvey by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Peter E. Kazanoff by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Paul C. Curnin by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Steven G. Hall by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robert G. Brazier by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Alexander Zolan by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Margaret A. Keeley by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Ryan Weiss by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Abigail Noebels by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Barry Barnett by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JJ)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Co. Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00020. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5021121), filed by Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., J. Tomilson Hill, Stephen A. Schwarzman, R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Michael Rudzik, Blackstone Group, Inc., William S. Cook, Girish Reddy, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, Ice Miller, LLP, George R. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 State Court Record Part 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit A-2 State Court Record Part 2 (Civil Cover Sheet, Summons & Case History), #3 Exhibit A-3 State Court Record Part 3 (Amended Complaint), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)
July 20, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
July 20, 2021 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in state court against Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P., Blackstone Group, Inc., Jane Buchan, Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC, William S. Cook, J. Tomilson Hill, Ice Miller, LLP, KKR & Co. Inc., KKR & Co., L.P., Henry R. Kravis, Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC, Prisma Capital Partners, L.P., R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc., Girish Reddy, George R. Roberts, Michael Rudzik, Stephen A. Schwarzman, filed by Tia Taylor, Bobby Estes, Ashley Hall-Nagy. Please see DE #1 -3 for PDF of document.(JJ) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (JJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. KKR & Co., L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Taylor
Represented By: James D. Baskin
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Walson
Represented By: Michelle Ciccarelli Lerach
Represented By: Michelle M. Ciccarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hall-Nagy
Represented By: James D. Baskin
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Walson
Represented By: Michelle Ciccarelli Lerach
Represented By: Michelle M. Ciccarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Estes
Represented By: James D. Baskin
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Walson
Represented By: Michelle Ciccarelli Lerach
Represented By: Michelle M. Ciccarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR & Co., L.P.
Represented By: Abigail Noebels
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Barry Barnett
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Ryan Weiss
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Steven Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry R. Kravis
Represented By: Abigail Noebels
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Barry Barnett
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Ryan Weiss
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Steven Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R. Roberts
Represented By: Abigail Noebels
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Barry Barnett
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Ryan Weiss
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Steven Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisma Capital Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Michael J. Garvey
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff
Represented By: Sara A. Ricciardi
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Michael S. Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girish Reddy
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Michael S. Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Brad S. Karp
Represented By: Brette Tannenbaum
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Virginia H. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Alternative Asset Management, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Brad S. Karp
Represented By: Brette Tannenbaum
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Virginia H. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tomilson Hill
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Brad S. Karp
Represented By: Brette Tannenbaum
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Virginia H. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Schwarzman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Brad S. Karp
Represented By: Brette Tannenbaum
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Virginia H. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Alternative Asset Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Michael J. Garvey
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff
Represented By: Sara A. Ricciardi
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Michael S. Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Buchan
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Michael J. Garvey
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff
Represented By: Sara A. Ricciardi
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Michael S. Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.V. Kuhns & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Represented By: Philip W. Collier
Represented By: Robin E. McGuffin
Represented By: Thad Montgomery Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavanaugh Macdonald Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Charles E. English, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Kenly Ames
Represented By: Robert G. Brazier
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Miller, LLP
Represented By: Alexander Zolan
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Margaret A. Keeley
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Alexander S. Zolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Cook
Represented By: Glenn A. Cohen
Represented By: Lynn M. Watson
Represented By: Glenn Alan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rudzik
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: David Elbaum
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Michael J. Garvey
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff
Represented By: Sara A. Ricciardi
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Michael S. Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Noebels
Represented By: Barbara B. Edelman
Represented By: Barry Barnett
Represented By: Grahmn Morgan
Represented By: John M. Spires
Represented By: Ryan Weiss
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Represented By: Steven Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Daniel Cameron
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Represented By: J. Christian Lewis
Represented By: Victor B. Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?