Dahlenburg v. SSA
Plaintiff: Sharon Dahlenburg
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00049
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Commissioner of SSA re #5 Order,,, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Morgan, Cheryl)
October 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins added. Judge Robert E. Wier no longer assigned to case. (JJ)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Magistrate Judge by Sharon Dahlenburg re #5 Order, (Wax, Alvin) Modified text on 10/21/2021 (JJ).
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Dahlenburg via Certified Mail to All Defendants. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail on 10/07/2021; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail on 10/13/2021. (Wax, Alvin)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The Court advises the parties of the availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to preside over this case and enter final Judgment. The parties shall confer (actually talk with each other) concerning whether they voluntarily consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The Court attaches a consent form to this Order. If all parties, by counsel, consent via signing the form, the Clerk shall reassign this matter to the appropriate Magistrate Judge on this docket without the necessity of further Order of the Court. See LR 73.1(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form)(JJ)cc: COR
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons EDKY US Attorney)(JJ)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5090760), filed by Sharon Dahlenburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons SSA, #4 Summons EDKY US Attorney)(JJ)
October 4, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Alvin D. Wax: It appears the address listed on your filing #1 Complaint is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlenburg v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dahlenburg
Represented By: Alvin D. Wax
Represented By: Greg Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?