Stewart v. INOAC Group North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Tyrone Stewart doing business as Nanya Akufu El
Defendant: INOAC Group North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00022
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #7 Case Transferred Out - Other District Transfer cc: form e-mailed to Register. (CBD)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: this action is TRANSFERRED to the Louisville Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/22/22.(CBD)cc: CORand Tyrone Stewart by US Mail
April 22, 2022 Clerk's Note: Case extracted and electronicallytransmitted to the USDC/KYWD via CM/ECF. (CBD)
April 22, 2022 Clerk's Note re #7 Order: Case has been opened in Western District of Kentucky as case 3:22-cv-00220, filed 04/22/2022. (CBD)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(JJ)cc: COR and Tyrone Stewart by US Mail
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (JJ)
April 21, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 21, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (JJ)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to INOAC Group North America, LLC; Summons issued and returned to pro se via pick-up from Office of Clerk (JJ)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 3002789), filed by Tyrone Stewart, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Trade Name, #2 Summons INOAC Group North America, LLC, #3 Receipt )(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. INOAC Group North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Stewart doing business as Nanya Akufu El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INOAC Group North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?