Cox et al v. Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. et al
Defendant: Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc., Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC and Thomas Scott
Executor: Jordan Cox, Taylor McVay and David Bleeker
Case Number: 3:2022cv00046
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct by David Bleeker, Jordan Cox, Taylor McVay (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Salyer, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Thomas Scott's motions for admission pro hac vice [R. #20 ; R. #21 ; R. #22 ] are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/13/2022. (JJ)cc: COR, George Morrison and Stephen Pezanosky by US Mail
October 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Robert Salyer re #24 MOTION to Amend/Correct by David Bleeker, Jordan Cox, Taylor McVay ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ)
October 13, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #10 Notice to Attorney James L. Wilkes, II - No response. (JJ)
October 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Stephen M. Pezanosky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Scott ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5380347) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Authorization, #4 Proposed Order)(Butler, Ashley)
October 5, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for George Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Scott ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5380276) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Authorization, #4 Proposed Order)(Butler, Ashley)
October 5, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Taryn McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Scott ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5380225) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Authorization, #4 Proposed Order)(Butler, Ashley)
October 5, 2022 Attorney Update. Attorney Stephen Pezanosky for Thomas Scott added. (CBD)
October 5, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Stephen Pezanosky, Bill Morrison, Taryn McDonald re #22 , #21 , #20 MOTIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CBD)
October 5, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #22 , #21 , #20 MOTIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CBD)
September 27, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #4 Notice to Attorney James L. Wilkes, II (JJ)
September 23, 2022 Filing 19 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc.. (Wicker, J.)
September 23, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Taryn McDonald by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (CBD)
September 23, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Bill Morrison by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (CBD)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: 1. Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice (R. #13 ; R. #14 ; R. #15 ) are GRANTED; and 2. Attorneys Oliver B. Curtis, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Matthew L. Knowles are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/22/2022. (CBD)cc: CORand Oliver B. Curtis, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Matthew L. Knowles by US Mail
September 23, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Oliver B. Curtis, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Matthew L. Knowles: re #16 Order request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Oliver B. Curtis, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Matthew L. Knowles (CBD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Matthew L. Knowles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368599) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew L. Knowles, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wicker, J.)
September 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Sarah P. Hogarth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368593) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah P. Hogarth, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wicker, J.)
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Oliver Benton Curtis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368567) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of B. Curtis, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wicker, J.)
September 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sarah Hogarth by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 LR 83.1 Info, #2 LR 83.2 Info)(CBD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Matthew Knowles by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 LR 83.1 Info, #2 LR 83.2 Info)(CBD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James L. Wilkes II by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 LR 83.1 Info, #2 LR 83.2 Info)(CBD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Bill Morrison by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 LR 83.1 packet, #2 LR 83.2 Info)(CBD)
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Benton Curtis by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 LR 83.1 packet, #2 LR 83.2)(CBD)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Motion #5 is GRANTED; 2. Defendants have to and including 10/24/2022 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/20/2022.(CBD)cc: COR
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, J. Kent Wicker. #5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. has been filed by Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc and Reliant Pro Rehab LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
September 21, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Matthew L. Knowles, Benton Curtis, Sarah P. Hogarth re #14 MOTION for Sarah P. Hogarth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368593), #15 MOTION for Matthew L. Knowles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368599), #13 MOTION for Oliver Benton Curtis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368567). (CBD)
September 21, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #14 MOTION for Sarah P. Hogarth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368593), #15 MOTION for Matthew L. Knowles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368599), #13 MOTION for Oliver Benton Curtis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5368567) (CBD)
September 20, 2022 Attorney Update. Attorney J. Kent Wicker,Matthew L. Knowles,Benton Curtis,Sarah P. Hogarth for Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC,J. Kent Wicker,Matthew L. Knowles,Benton Curtis,Sarah P. Hogarth for Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc.,Bill Morrison,Tarym McDoanld,Ashley J. Butler for Thomas Scott added. (CBD)
September 20, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. (CBD)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc.. (Wicker, J.)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James L. Wilkes, II by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JJ)
August 22, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
August 22, 2022 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK DELETING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD: Lift Stay. The deleted entry was entered on 8/22/2022. Document deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. *TDA* cc: COR (JJ)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC, Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc., Thomas Scott; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Reliant Pro Rehab, #2 Summons Thomas Scott)(JJ)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5343394), filed by Taylor McVay, Jordan Cox, David Bleeker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Scott Depo, #3 Exhibit B - Jane Doe Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Donchatz Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Qui Tam Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Baber Depo, #8 Exhibit G - Scott Note, #9 Exhibit H - Brief in Support, #10 Exhibit I - Email Correspondence, #11 Exhibit J - Articles of Justice, #12 Notice of Service, #13 Summons Reliant Rehabilitation, #14 Summons Reliant Pro Rehab, #15 Summons Thomas Scott)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jordan Cox
Represented By: Erica M. Roland
Represented By: James L. Wilkes, II
Represented By: Robert Earl Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Taylor McVay
Represented By: Erica M. Roland
Represented By: James L. Wilkes, II
Represented By: Robert Earl Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: David Bleeker
Represented By: Erica M. Roland
Represented By: James L. Wilkes, II
Represented By: Robert Earl Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Rehabilitation Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Matthew L. Knowles
Represented By: Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Matthew L. Knowles
Represented By: Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Scott
Represented By: Ashley Johnson Butler
Represented By: Bill Morrison
Represented By: Stephen Pezanosky
Represented By: Taryn McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?