The United States Of America et al v. Lexington-Fayette Urban County Government

Case Number: 5:2006cv00386
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Karl S. Forester
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION & ORDER: (1) LFUCG's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, & summary judgment will be entered in favor of LFUCG & (2) judgment consistent w/this Opinion & Order will be entered contemporaneously. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 04/14/2011. (RJD)cc: COR
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons set forth, the Court ORDERS Intervening plft's 78 Motion for Attorney Fees & costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 03/22/2011. (RJD)cc: COR
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that the USA's 49 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 10/2/2008.(SCD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States Of America et al v. Lexington-Fayette Urban County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?