Olinger v. The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al Featured Case

Plaintiff sued defendants the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Charles Addison and Jason Starks. Plaintiff alleges that defendant Starks,while serving as a missionary of the LDS Church, engaged in sexual misconduct and deviate sexual intercourse with plaintiff's minor child.

Plaintiff: Barbara Olinger
Defendant: Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints and Jason Starks
Case Number: 5:2007cv00029
Filed: January 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Presiding Judge: James B Todd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25
ORDER GRANTING pla's 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to dft's 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Response due within 15 days of this order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
March 28, 2007 Filing 22
NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO BRUCE WILLIAM FRANCISKY, a non-registered atty re 21 Order on Motion to Remand had to be MAILED TO a non-registered atty, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR (KJR)
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20
ORDER GRANTING pla's 16 Motion to Amend/Correct dft's name; all further pleadings shall identify dft by its proper name of Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
March 23, 2007 Filing 17
DISCLOSURES Plaintiff Barbara Olinger, Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Brenda Olinger.(Stidham, Michael)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11
SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) REFERRED to Mag Judge Todd for discovery disputes; (2) REFERRED for expedited settlement processes; (3) Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2007; (4) Discovery due by 12/31/2007; (5) Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2008; (6) expert witness reports due by - pla 2/1/08 - dft 3/1/08; (7) motions in limine due by 6/18/08; (8) REFERRED for initial pretrial conference; (9) pretrial filings due 1 week before Mag Judge Todd's initial pt conf; (10) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/14/2008 10:00 AM; (11) COURT TRIAL set for 8/12/2008 09:00 AM (4-5 days).Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood (KJR)cc: COR,JBT,D
March 9, 2007 Filing 9
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fleischaker, Jon)
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER (1) parties meet within 21 days & exhcange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due within 10 days after the meeting. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood (KJR)cc: COR
February 6, 2007 Filing 4
ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Starks.(Pafunda, Bernard)
January 26, 2007 Filing 3
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (KJR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olinger v. The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Olinger
Represented By: Michael A. Stidham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Represented By: Jeremy Stuart Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Starks
Represented By: Bernard Pafunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?