Williamson v. USA

Plaintiff: Gary Edward Williamson
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 5:2012cv00334
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Gary Williamson and against Defendant United States of America and that damages be awarded to Mr. Williamson in the amount of $224,334.39, plus interest from the date of judgment. A separate judgment will be entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/21/2016.(STC)cc: COR
July 27, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING the Government's 79 MOTION for Clarification; granting to the extent that Dr. Jeng's testimony will be presented by his depo at trial, rather than live testimony; (2) that pla will be permitted to present summaries of evidence at trial; (3) that evidence shall be admitted or excluded as discussed herein. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/27/15.(KJR)cc: COR
June 15, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Gvt's motion for s/j, 55 , is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 1. Any damages award under the Federal Tort Claims act shall be offset by the following: the value of Pla's medical benefits under TRICARE$6,446,07 and the value of Pla's FECA benefits$127,155.09. 2. The US' motion for s/j is denied with respect to Pla's retirement disability benefits. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/15/2015.(LC)cc: COR
February 3, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's 25 Motion Amend the Court's Order to include 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) certification is, DENIED. Defendant SHALL answer Amended Complaint within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/3/2014. (STC)cc: COR
September 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Dft's 14 Motion to Dismiss; Motion for Summary Judgment DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/5/2013. (STC)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Edward Williamson
Represented By: William R. Garmer
Represented By: Jerome Park Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?