Vaughn v. Konecranes, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Vincent Vaughn
Defendant: Konecranes, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Konecranes, Inc.
Thirdparty_defendant: Demag Cranes and Compenents Corp and Hetronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00136
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Bourbon
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Wier
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Konecranes' 161 Motion to Supplement Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/19/2016. (STC)cc: COR
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Third-party Dft CMWA's 105 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, in part, re Konecranes' common law indemnity claim, & DENIED re Konecranes' contractual indemnity claim; 2. Third-party Pla Konecranes' 112 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, in part, re contractual indemnity, & DENIED as it relates to the common law indemnity claim. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on May 29, 2015. (MWZ) cc: COR
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that Pla's 142 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/26/2015.(SCD)cc: COR
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Dft Konecranes' 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; All of pla's remaining claims against Konecranes are DISMISSED, with prejudice; 2. The pending motions in limine rela ted to these claims (Records Nos. 98 , 99 , 100 , 101 , 102 , 103 , 104 , 107 , 108 ) are DENIED as MOOT; The third-party motions (Record Nos. 105 , 106 ) remain pending before the Court; 3. On/before 4/24/2015, the parties subject to the remaining motions, i.e., the third-party pla & third-party dfts, are directed to address the viability of the remaining claims & motions (Record Nos. 105 , 106 ). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on April 15, 2015. (MWZ) cc: COR
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: GRANTING dft Konecranes' 96 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's expert, Frederick Heath, from testifying at trial by Konecranes, Inc. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/13/15.(KJR)cc: COR
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: GRANTING Konecranes' 97 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Reference To Insurance At Trial; the parties may not offer evidence, arguments or statement to the jury re insurance coverage; parties' additional motions is limine remain pending & will be addressed by a separate order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/30/15.(KJR)cc: COR
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Third Party Defendant CMWA's 72 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim is GRANTED; 2. Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Answer and Counterclaim previously tendered by Third Party Defendant CMWA (Record No. 72- 2). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on January 22, 2015. (MWZ) cc: COR
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Third-Party Dft Demag's 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; 2. Dft Konecranes' third-party claims against Demag are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on December 2, 2014. (MWZ) cc: COR
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Konecrane's 32 Motion for partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to Konecrane's design, manufacture, sale, and delivery of the crane. The motion is DENIED with respect to Konecrane's design, manufacture, sale, and delivery of components of the crane and failure to warn. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/2/2014. (STC)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Konecranes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Vincent Vaughn
Represented By: David Rollins Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konecranes, Inc.
Represented By: Jane C. Higgins
Represented By: Jennifer Maria Jabroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Konecranes, Inc.
Represented By: Jane C. Higgins
Represented By: Jennifer Maria Jabroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Demag Cranes and Compenents Corp
Represented By: Christopher Rennie Cashen
Represented By: Christopher Lyle Jackson
Represented By: Catherine Amanda Stivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Hetronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?