ClubSpecialists Intl. LLC v. Keeneland Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: ClubSpecialists Intl. LLC
Defendant: Keeneland Association, Inc.
Intervenor_defendant: Keeneland Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00345
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JUDGMENT: (1) Plaintiff ClubSpecialists' motion for summary judgment, 83 , is DENIED; (2) Defendant Keeneland Association and Intervenor Defendant Keeneland Hospitality's motion for summary judgment, 84 , is GRANTED with respect to Coun ts I, II, and III of Plaintiff ClubSpecialists' first amended complaint and to Counts II, III, and V of Intervenor Defendant's second amended intervening counterclaim; (3) Defendant Keeneland Association and Intervenor Defendant Keeneland H ospitality's motion for summary judgement, 84 , is DENIED with respect to Count I of Intervenor Defendant's second amended intervening counterclaim; (4) Intervenor Defendant Keeneland Hospitality, LLC's, motion for summary judgment on damages, 97 , is DENIED; and (5) This Judgment is FINAL and APPEALABLE. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/26/2018.(STC)cc: COR
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 83 is DENIED; (2) Defendant and Intervenor Defendant's motion for summary judgment 84 is GRANTED with respect to Counts I, II, and III of Plaintiff's first amended comp laint and to Counts II, III, and V of Intervenor Defendant's second amended intervening counterclaim. (3) Defendant and Intervenor Defendant's motion for summary judgment 84 is DENIED with respect to Count I of Intervenor Defendant's second amended intervening counterclaim. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/1/2018. (STC)cc: COR
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER:(1) Dft Keeneland's 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED; (2) the Protective Order 23 previously granted by this Court is VACATED and parties SHALL proceed w/ formulating discovery plan; (2) TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 3/2/2017 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/8/2017.(STC)cc: COR,D
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ClubSpecialists Intl. LLC v. Keeneland Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ClubSpecialists Intl. LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Represented By: Emma R. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeneland Association, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Keeneland Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?