Halsey et al v. AGCO Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Scott Halsey and Kimberly Halsey
Defendant: AGCO Corporation, Titan International, Inc. and Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv00461
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Menifee
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) 124 Motion to Stay Dfts' Motions for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (2) 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (3) 97 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (4) 107 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/20/2017.(SCD)cc: COR
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 60 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of 7/27/2017 are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/10/2017.(SCD)cc: COR
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/30/2017.(SCD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halsey et al v. AGCO Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Halsey
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Halsey
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Matthew R. Parsons
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan International, Inc.
Represented By: Bradly Edward Moore
Represented By: Amanda Lee Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Bradly Edward Moore
Represented By: Amanda Lee Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?