Adkins v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Anthony Adkins
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 5:2018cv00156
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership I with respect to all claims asserted in this civil action by Plaintiff Anthony Adkins. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/28/2018.(STC)cc: COR
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: plaintiff's 34 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/17/2018. (STC)cc: COR
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. dft's 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. 2. plt's claims for failure to provide a reasonable accommodation and failure to engage in an interactive process, equitable estoppel, and attorneys fees ( 21 , 26-38) are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/11/2018.(STC)cc: COR
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's 8 MOTION to Remand is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct is GRANTED. Clerk directed to file Amended complaint previously tendered. 3. Defendant's 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/3/2018.(GLD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Adkins
Represented By: Jason D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Benjamin Gerald Dusing
Represented By: Angela M. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?