Wesley v. Accessible Home Care, et al

Plaintiff: Misty Lynn Wesley
Defendant: Accessible Home Care, Bill Hughes and Kaye Hughes
Case Number: 5:2018cv00200
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Wier
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant's 74 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. 2. Related case 5:18-CV-377-DCR is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and STRICKEN from the docket. 3. A corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/6/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff via US Mail Modified text on 12/6/2018 (JJ).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM ORDER & OPINION: Defendant AHC's 33 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/26/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, dft via us mail Modified text on 9/27/2018 (JJ).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) This matter is CONSOLIDATED w 5:18-cv-200. This Order shall be docketed in 5:18-cv-377 and 5:18-cv-200. All further filings related to these actions shall be docketed in 5:18-cv-200 only. 2) MOTION to Dismiss is GRA NTED. All claims asserted herein are DISMISSED w prejudice with the exception of Wesley's FLSA claims against Defendant Accessible Home Care, which are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/29/2018.(SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla via US Mail
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING dft's 13 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Wesley's non-FLSA claims, pursuant to Court's Certification Order; (2) Wesley's claims against dfts Bill Hughes & Kaye Hughes are DISMISSED & these dfts are terminated as parties in this action; (3) dft Accessible Health Care must RESPOND to Wesley's FLSA claims as described in this Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/5/18.(KJR)cc: COR, Wesley (US Mail)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. The Magistrate Judge's Order denying certification 5 is ADOPTED, in part, and REJCECTED, in part; 2. Plaintiff's 6 MOTION under Rule 72(b)(2) of FRCP is GRANTED, in part, and DEN IED, in part; 3. Pltf's claims against Dfts Michelle Walters, Sheila Hughes Rouse, Mark Williams, and Commonwealth of Kentucky Unemployment Office are DISMISSED with prejudice. Pltf's claims against Accessible Home Care, Bill Hughes, and K ay Hughes are DISMISSED with prejudice, with the exception of the Fair Labor Standards Act claim against these three defendants; 4. Pltf has 21 days to file a Complaint relating only to FLSA claims against Dfts Accessible Home Care, Bill Hughes, and Kay Hughes. Upon filing, Pltf is directed to tender $400 filing fee to Clerk of Court or file a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis; 5. Pltf is required to keep Clerk of Court informed of her current mailing address. Failure to notify Clerk of any change of address may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/26/2018.(KM)cc: Pltf via U.S. Mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. Accessible Home Care, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Lynn Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accessible Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?