Chenault v. Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics et al
Plaintiff: Cory L. Chenault, Sr.
Defendant: Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics, Anna Lewis, Jessica Martin, Saddle Creek Logistics Services and Zach Purdom
Case Number: 5:2018cv00276
Filed: April 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION & ORDER: 1. 70 MOTION to Strike 69 Sur Reply by Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics is GRANTED. 2. 60 JOINT MOTION To Enforce October 1, 2018 Settlement Agreement is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. To the ext ent that the Motion seeks enforcement of the verbal agreement reached at the Settlement Conference on October 1, 2018, it is GRANTED. To the extent that the Motion seeks an Order from this Court requiring Chenault to sign a written agreement and s tipulation of dismissal, it is DENIED. 3. Dfts shall tender payment of $3,600 via certified mail to Cory L. Chenault, Sr. by sending it to address listed in Court's record. Payment shall be tendered no later than 5/24/19. 4. Proof of tendered payment shall be filed in record. 5. Upon proof of payment tendered by certified mail, Court will dismiss case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/20/2019.(GLD)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION & ORDER: Court ORDERS that plaintiff's 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/5/2018.(GLD)cc: COR, pro se plaintiff
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics, Anna Lewis, and Jessica Martin 25 is GRANTED; (2) Defendants Anna Lewis and Jessica Martin are TERMINATED as Defendants in this matter; (3) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with respect to his claims for discrimination, emotional stress, future wages, loss of employment, punitive and exemplary damages, and any other statute or law. Plaintiff's claim for unpaid wages and overtime under the FLSA may proceed; (4) Plaintiff's Motion to Facilitate Settlement 29 is GRANTED; (5) the parties may contact Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman directly for the purpose of schedul ing a settlement conference; (6) Defendant Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative Seal, Exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion to Facilitate Settlement 38 is GRANTED; (7) The Clerk of the Court shall SEAL Plaintiffs Exhibit to his Motion to Facilitate Settlement ( 29 -1). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/17/2018.(STC)cc: COR,Plt,JGW Modified on 8/17/2018 (STC).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenault v. Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory L. Chenault, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad USA Manufacturing and Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddle Creek Logistics Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Purdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?