Harris v. Clifford et al
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Harris
Defendant: Dr. Clifford and Shelly C. Vottaw
Respondent: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Case Number: 5:2018cv00491
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
2 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN of Service by USM re summons served upon Correct Care Solutions, LLC on 9/17/18. (KJR)
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Clifford, Shelly C. Vottaw Corrected Subpoena Duces Tecum to Obtain Plaintiff's Grievance Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Sharp, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Clifford, Shelly C. Vottaw Intent to Obtain Medical Records via Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Sharp, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Clifford, Shelly C. Vottaw Intent to Obtain UK Medical Records via Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Sharp, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Clifford, Shelly C. Vottaw Notice of Intent to Obtain Grievance Records via Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Sharp, William)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) This matter is REFERRED to a US Magistrate Judge to conduct all further proceedings, including preparing proposed findings of fact and recommendations on any dispositive motions. 2) Clerk is directed to assign this matter to a US Magistrate Judge. (Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith randomly drawn.) Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/24/2018.(SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
September 24, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint, #13 Answer to Complaint (SCD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Clifford, Shelly C. Vottaw.(Sharp, William)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel D. Harris via USMS to Clifford served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Shelly C. Vottaw served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SCD)
September 13, 2018 Clerk's Note: re #11 Order: summons were issued & delivered to USM on this date. (KJR)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: (1) Deputy Clerk shall prepare a service packet for dfts "Dr. Clifford & Shelly C. Vottaw; (2) Deputy Clerk shall deliver service packets to USM & note the date of delivery; (3) USM shall make arrangements w/appropriate officials at the Northpoint Training Center to personally serve "Dr. Clifford" & Shelly C. Vottaw; (4) USM shall send a service packet by cert mail to Correct Care Solutions, LLC's registered agent for service of process. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/13/18.(KJR)cc: COR,USM, Harris (US Mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #1 Summons) (KJR).
September 10, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #10 RESPONSE to #6 Order by Kentucky Department of Corrections (SCD)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Order filed by Kentucky Department of Corrections. Order regarding service (Brown, Allison) Modified on 9/10/2018 (SCD).
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #6 Order: Received by Office of Legal Services, no date listed on green card. (SCD)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kentucky Department of Corrections on behalf of Shelly C. Vottaw on 8/14/2018 by Samuel D. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(SCD)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kentucky Department of Corrections on behalf of Dr. Clifford on 8/14/2018 by Samuel D. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(SCD)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2) Harris must pay $8.15 to Clerk as an initial partial filing fee w/in 28 days. 3) Clerk shall open an acct in Harris's name for receipt of the filing fee. Clerk shall complete a Form EDKy 525 and send a copy of the Notice and this Order to the Jailer/Warden. 4) After Harris pays the initial partial filing fee, each month custodian shall send the Clerk a payment. Continue until entire filing fee is paid. 5) Clerk shall complete two AO Form 398 and two AO Form 399 addressed to Ky Dept of Corrections on behalf of Dfts. 6) Clerk shall send by certified mail, return receipt requested, two copies each of the Complaint, this Order the AO Forms 398 and 399 to Office of Legal Services, Ky Dept of Corrections. 7) Counsel shall have 30 days to complete and file the Form AO 399 to waive service for the Dfts. If waived, Dfts shall have 60 days to answer. If waiver is not filed, USMS shall personally serve the Dfts and the answer filed NLT 21 days after service. 8) Should counsel not represent any of the Dfts, Court requests counsel to provide a forwarding or last known address for those Dfts. If the address is not a matter of public record, counsel shall file it under seal.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525) (SCD)cc: F,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail), Jailer/Warden(via US Mail w form), Ky Dept of Corrections (via certified mail w forms and pleadings)
August 13, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel D. Harris (SCD)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(SCD)
August 13, 2018 Conflict Check run. (SCD)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Samuel D. Harris (Pro Se). (SCD)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel D. Harris (Pro Se).Motions referred to P SO. (SCD)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Samuel D. Harris (Pro Se). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Medical Paper, #2 Exhibit - Grievance, #3 Envelope (No Postmark))(SCD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Clifford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clifford
Represented By: William Ellis Sharp
Represented By: Megan Pullem O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly C. Vottaw
Represented By: William Ellis Sharp
Represented By: Megan Pullem O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Represented By: Allison R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?