Pendermon v. Madison County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Sherry Macintosh, Tammy Allen, Madison County Detention Center, Doug Thomas, Doctor Roy and Nurse Tammy
Case Number: 5:2018cv00495
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue trial by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked Sept 18 2018)(STC)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Andre Pendermon re legal representation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked Sept 20 2018) (STC)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1. Pendermon shall file a response to the defendant's motion to dismiss #10 on or before October 5, 2018. 2. The defendant shall file any reply on or before October 19, 2018. At that time the briefing upon the motion shall be CLOSED and the matter will stand submitted for decision. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/13/2018.(STC)cc: COR,Plt
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Tammy , MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Tammy Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Margaret)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tammy.(Brannon, Margaret)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Andre Pendermon re #5 Order, (STC) Modified on 8/30/2018 (STC). Address verified and mail resent to plt this date.
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed via U.S. Marshal to Tammy served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (KM)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nurse Tammy. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (STC)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Pendermon's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. 2. Because Pendermon has a negative balance in his inmate account, payment of the initial partial filing fee is DEFERRED. 3. Clerk shall open an account in Pendermon's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) and shall send a copy of the Notice and this Order to the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Pendermon is currently confined. 4. Each month Pendermon's custodian shall send Clerk a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. plaintiff's claims against the Madison County Detention Center; Southern Health Partners; receptionist Sherry Macintosh; Class D Coordinator Tommy Allen; Deputy Jailer Doug Thomas; and "Doctor Roy" are DISMISSED. 6. Clerk shall prepare a "Service Packet" for defendant "Nurse Tammy." Each Service Packet shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. the complaint #1 ; c. this Order; and d. a completed USM Form 285. 7. Clerk shall deliver the Service Packet to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 8. USMS shall make arrangements with officials at the Madison County Detention Center to personally serve the Service Packet upon "Nurse Tammy" by hand delivery at the Madison County Detention Center. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525)(STC)cc: Plt,USM,Finance
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(STC)
August 16, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon (STC)
August 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se (with incomplete Certificate of Inmate Account) (Attachments: #1 Letter from plaintiff)(STC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Andre S. Pendermon, pro se.(STC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2018) (STC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2018: #1 Envelope postmarked Aug 13 2018) (STC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendermon v. Madison County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Macintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Tammy
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre S. Pendermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?