Hull v. Quintana
Petitioner: Brad Christopher Hull
Respondent: Francisco J. Quintana
Case Number: 5:2018cv00517
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Hull's #12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is GRANTED and payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. 2. The Clerk of this Court shall send a copy to the 6CCA Clerk. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/23/18.(JJ)cc: COR, 6CCA
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Brad Christopher Hull Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 back of envelope)(JLM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 18-6017 Case Manager Karen S. Fultz for #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Brad Christopher Hull. (JJ)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Judgment, #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #4 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se. cc: COR, 6CCA, pro se petitioner (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 9-24-18) Filed Per Order #9 .(GLD)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Clerk shall refile Hull's #8 MOTION to Clarify as a notice of appeal with the filing date of 9/26/18. 2. Clerk shall send Hull a Six Circuit Form 4 and a Certificate of Inmate Account Form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 3. W/in 30 days, Hull must either pay $505 appellate filing fee or: a. complete Sixth Circuit Form 4; b. have prison staff complete Cert of Inmate Account Form; and c. file both documents with Court. 4. If Hull believes Court misconstrued his submitted at DE #8, he may file a motion to reconsider. 5. Hull's #8 motion to clarify is otherwise DENIED AS MOOT to extent that he seeks any additional relief from this Court. 6. Clerk shall send copy of this Order and notice of appeal to 6CCA Clerk. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/26/2018.(GLD)cc: COR, pro se Petitioner w/6CCA Form 4 and EDKY 523; 6CCA
September 26, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #8 MOTION to Clarify by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se (JJ)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Clarify by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope post marked 9/24/18)(JJ) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (JJ).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: #6 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/20/2018. (SCD)cc: Pro Se Petitioner via US Mail
September 19, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Reconsideration by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se (Styled as a letter) (JJ)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se (styled as a letter) Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envlope post marked 9/17/18)(JJ)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: 1. Hull's petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 is DENIED. 2. Action is DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. FINAL AND APPEALABLE Judgment and no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/17/2018.(GLD)cc: COR, Pro Se Petitioner
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. IT IS ORDERED that Hull's petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 is DENIED. 2. This action is DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. Corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/17/2018.(GLD)cc: COR, Pro se petitioner
September 11, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #3 Filing Fee Received (JJ)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee received - $ 5.00, receipt number 5026149 (JJ)
September 4, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus- No fee paid/IFP motion (JJ)
September 4, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brad Christopher Hull, pro se - No Filing Fee/IFP motion (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #2 Mailing Envelope dated 8/30/2018) (JJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brad Christopher Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francisco J. Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?