Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc. v. ML Georgetown Paris, LLC

Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc.
Defendant: ML Georgetown Paris, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00524
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: 1. parties' proposed stipulation is GRANTED, in part. This matter is held in abeyance for 45 days; 3. dft's #11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction are DENIED, without prejudice to being renewed at the end of the stay period of settlement discussions not successful; 3. parties shall promptly tender an Agreed Order of Dismissal, with prejudice if they resolve dispute during stay period. Otherwise, the stay shall be lifted at the end of the 45-day period and the defendant may renew its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/24/2018.(STC)cc: COR
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO HOLD CASE/DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IN ABEYANCE FOR 45 DAYS TO ALLOW FOR SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC, Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc. (Redford, Carroll) Modified filers on 10/25/2018 (STC).
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Greg McDonald, #2 Proposed Order Dismissing)(Redford, Carroll)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC. (Redford, Carroll)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Carroll Redford. #6 Waiver of Service Executed has been filed by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KJR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #5 Proposed Order. The deadline for responding to the Complaint is extended through October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/24/2018.(SCD)cc: COR
September 21, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (KJR)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC. (Redford, Carroll)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC. ML Georgetown Paris, LLC waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Redford, Carroll)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER / STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued Waiver of Service & Agreement to respond by 10/15/18 by ML Georgetown Paris, LLC. (Redford, Carroll) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (KJR).
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hibbett Sports, Inc. for Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc... (Smith, James)
September 10, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ML Georgetown Paris, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4163542), filed by Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lease, #2 Exhibit B First Amendment, #3 Exhibit C Second Amendment,, #4 Exhibit D D Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit E Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit F Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit G Sixth Amendment, #8 Exhibit H Seventh Amendment, #9 Exhibit I Eighth Amendment, #10 Exhibit J 4-3-2018 Letter, #11 Exhibit K Estoppel Certificate, #12 Exhibit L 4-30-2018 Email, #13 Exhibit M 6-1-2018 Letter, #14 Exhibit N 8-10-2018 Letter, #15 Exhibit O 8-21-2018 Letter, #16 Exhibit P 8-22-2018 Letter, #17 Exhibit Q 8-29-2018 Letter, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons Tendered)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc. v. ML Georgetown Paris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Georgetown Paris, LLC
Represented By: Carroll M. Redford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Darren W. Ford
Represented By: James Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?