Resenbeck v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: David S. Resenbeck
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00618
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: (1) Any proceedings and dealines in this matter are CONTINUED GENERALLY; (2) Any pending requests for relief in this matter are DENIED AS MOOT: (3) Parties shall submit an agreed stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report within 45 days. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/11/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
January 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #7 Status Report, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Suspending Case Management Deadlines Pending Settlement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America (JJ)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Suspending Case Management Deadlines Pending Settlement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT & Notice of Settlement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Within 21 days parties shall meet to discuss prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to arrange for disclosures, and to develop a proposed plan. 2) Within 10 days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint written status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/6/2018.(JJ)cc: COR
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Eric M. Lamb by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JLM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Notice, #2 Admission Check) (JLM).
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (JLM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Other Affiliate Safeco Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Insurance Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (JLM)
November 20, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fleming Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-166. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4219601), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resenbeck v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Resenbeck
Represented By: Eric M. Lamb
Represented By: Andrew W. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?