Hill v. Federal Medical Center, Lexington, KY

Petitioner: Larry D. Hill, Jr.
Respondent: Federal Medical Center, Lexington, KY
Case Number: 5:2018cv00654
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Action DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. FINAL AND APPEALABLE Judgment and no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/20/2019.(GLD)cc: COR, pro se plaintiff
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Order of Court. 2. All pending requests for relief DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Court will enter appropriate Judgment. 4. Matter is STRICKEN from Court's docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/20/2019.(GLD)cc: COR, pro se plaintiff
February 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #3 Order - Documents nor filing received (KM)
January 9, 2019 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Larry D. Hill, Jr. re #6 Letter : Please find enclosed a free copy of the Notice of Appeal form and the Motion for Pauper Status form in response to your request. cc: Larry D. Hill, Jr. by US Mail (STC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Larry Hill requesting appeal forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked Jan 7 2019) (STC)
January 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Larry D. Hill, Jr MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Larry D. Hill, Jr (GLD)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/ORDER for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Larry D. Hill, Jr., pro se. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry Hill, #2 Administrative Attachment, #3 Supporting document, #4 Envelope postmark illegible)(GLD)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(STC)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: 1. Hill's motion for injunctive relief #1 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Clerk shall mark assigned case number on a form Civil Rights Complaint [EDKY Form 520] and send it to Hill. Clerk shall also send Hill (1) an Affidavit of Assets / In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240] and (2) a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523]. 3. Should Hill wish to pursue this claim, he must complete and file the complaint form, describing the facts of his case, specifically identifying the people, dates, places, and actions which are relevant to his claims, and explain what he wants the Court to do. 4. In addition, Hill must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative feesor (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application, and (3) file both of them with the Court. 5. Hill must take these steps within 30 days, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 520, #2 AO-240, #3 EDKy 523) (STC)cc: Plt
December 27, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. No filing fee received. (STC)
December 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/ORDER/MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE, for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, filed by Larry D. Hill, Jr., pro se (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USA Status Report, #2 Declaration, #3 Administrative Remedy, #4 Envelope postmarked Dec 21 2018)(STC) Modified on 12/27/2018 (STC). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 12/27/2018 (STC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Federal Medical Center, Lexington, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry D. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Medical Center, Lexington, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?