K.K. v. Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky et al

Plaintiff: K.K.
Defendant: Kris Createau, Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky and Becca Boyd
Case Number: 5:2019cv00005
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days, counsel conduct Rule 26(f) meeting to discuss possibilities for prompt resolution and develop proposed discovery plan; 2. At time of meeting, exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, counsel file written joint report re proposed discovery plan. Consent forms attached. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(STC)cc: COR
February 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #7 Answer to Complaint, (STC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky, Becca Boyd(In her Individual Capacity), Becca Boyd(7th Grade Counselor Roy D. Campbell Junior High School, in her Official Capacity), Kris Createau(In her Individual Capacity), Kris Createau(Assistant Principal Roy D. Campbell Junior High School, in her Official Capacity).(Deener, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, 1. The construed motion #5 , is GRANTED. 2. The defendants shall have up to and including February 21, 2019, to file responsive pleadings to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/15/2019.(STC)cc: COR
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time to Answer by Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky, Becca Boyd(In her Individual Capacity), Becca Boyd(7th Grade Counselor Roy D. Campbell Junior High School, in her Official Capacity), Kris Createau(In her Individual Capacity), Kris Createau(Assistant Principal Roy D. Campbell Junior High School, in her Official Capacity). (Deener, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.K. via Clark County Sheriff to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Createau, #2 Summons Boyd)(Dove, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky, Becca Boyd, Kris Createau; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JLM)
January 10, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4257414), filed by K.K (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clark County Board of Education, #3 Summons Becca Boyd, #4 Summons Kris Creteau)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.K. v. Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Createau
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Clark County Kentucky
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becca Boyd
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K.
Represented By: Edward E. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?