Miles v. Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Miles
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00021
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. All discovery disputes are REFERRED to a Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) for appropriate resolution pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); 2. The Court encourages early & economic case resolution. If parties wish to mediate by magistrate judge, they shall file a joint motion; 3. Initial disclosures exchanged by 3/28/2019; 4. Motions to amend pleadings or join additional parties due by 9/30/2019; 5. Fact discover due by 11/23/2019 and Expert or opinion discovery due by 2/18/2020; 6. Supplementation of fact discovery served by 12/30/2019; 7. Identity & reports from expert or opinion witnesses disclosed by Plaintiff by 10/28/2019, by Defendant by 12/30/2019; 8. Dispositive Motions & daubert motions due by 3/13/2020; 9. All other motions in limine due by 4/6/2020; 10. Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as otherwise provided herein this order; 11. At least 1 week before final PTC, counsel shall: a. file exhibit lists; b. Premark & display to opposing counsel all exhibits intended for trial; c. file witness lists; d. file pretrial memorandum; e. file agreed proposed jury instructions; 12. This matter assigned for FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on 5/18/2020 at 11:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; 13. The case is assigned for JURY TRIAL on 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (3 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/20/2019.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC, Atty Sweitzer via U.S. mail
March 20, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harned, J.)
February 22, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Stephanie L. Sweitzer for Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc. added. (JLM)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. Within 21 days from the date of service of this Order, parties shall meet and develop a proposed discovery plan; 2. Within 10 days after meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/21/2019.(KM)cc: COR
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America Inc., for Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc... (Kamer, Mauritia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc..(Kamer, Mauritia)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLM)
January 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4269925), filed by Brian Miles. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Miles
Represented By: Albert F. Grasch, Jr.
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Mauritia Gauvin Kamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?