Moore v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elena Moore
Defendant: The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00022
Filed: January 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) dft shall file the administrative record by 3/29/19; pla's objections due by 4/12/19; (2) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 5/03/2019; (3) pla discovery due by 5/17/19; (4) dft shall (i) respond to the proposed disc or (ii) notify pla in writing that the pla is not entitled to conduct the proposed disc, or that all or a portion of the proposed disc is outside the bounds of disc permitted in a claim seeking the recovery of an ERISA benefit by no later than June 14, 2019; (5) should parties be unable to agree re proposed disc, pla shall file any motion by 6/28/19; (6) by 7/12/19 parties shall either (a) stipulate to the standard of review applicable to this action or (b) submit memoranda of points and authorities re the standard of review applicable to this action; (7) parties file motions for judgment by 8/13/19 or any mot re disc remain pending w/court at that date, w/in 60 days after the resolution of disc mots & the close of disc; (8) response due w/in 30 days after parties motions; (9) reply briefs due w/in 15 days after parties file response briefs; (10) parties may request oral argument by separate mot or through their briefs. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/14/19.(JLM)cc: COR
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Turner, Ann)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days, counsel conduct Rule 26(f) meeting to discuss possibilities for prompt resolution of case and to develop proposed discovery plan; 2. At time of meeting, counsel exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, counsel file written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan. Consent forms attached. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(STC)cc: COR
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company.(Turner, Ann)
January 28, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
January 26, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company.(STC)
January 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-790. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4270098), filed by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann Michelle Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?