Olding v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Susan Olding
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00024
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the above referenced action be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice, and stricken from the Court's docket, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/26/2019.(KM)cc: COR
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Calhoun, David)
March 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #9 Notice of Settlement (KJR)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Life Insurance Company of North America (Calhoun, David)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re #7 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Scheduling Order: The Court ORDERS: 1. NLT 3/20/2019 parties shall confer & file written report setting standard of review & file record before plan administrator; 2. If unable to agree on standard of review, parties shall file a brief by 4/4/2019; 3. NLT 4/19/2019, plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment; 4. NLT 30 days following filing of motion, defendant shall file a response; 5. NLT 15 days following filing of response, plaintiff may file a reply; 6. Upon the filing of above, the case shall stand submitted. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/5/2019.(KM)cc: COR
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Scheduling Order, by Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calhoun, David)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) NLT 30 days, counsel confer and file written joint report re appropriate standards of review and file record before plan administrator; (2) NLT 60 days, plt file motion for jgm reversing administrative decision; (3) NLT 30 days after filing of plt's motion, dft file response; (4) NLT 15 days after filing of response, plt file reply; (5) upon filing, case shall stand submitted. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/4/2019.(STC)cc: COR
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Calhoun, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent cigna corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Calhoun, David)
January 28, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company, Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America. (STC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00679. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4270669), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olding v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Olding
Represented By: Robert L. Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?